EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY v. 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1 - 49, National Foam Inc, Buckeye Fire Equipment CO, Tyco Fire Products LP, 3M Company and Chemguard Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv03488
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 33 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern Florida, 3:18-cv-01445, Emerald Coast Utilties Authority v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03488-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 32 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-01445. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 18, 2018 Filing 31 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (certified copy) from the Clerk, District of South Carolina, re MDL 2873. (sdw) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Stefan Alvarez, Esquire is substituted as counsel for Defendant, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co. Attorney Morgan Vasigh is relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/5/2018. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
November 5, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #29 AGREED MOTION For Substitution of Counsel by BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT CO. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 29 AGREED MOTION For Substitution of Counsel by BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT CO. (VASIGH, MORGAN) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by STEFAN ALVAREZ on behalf of BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT CO (ALVAREZ, STEFAN) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF STAY - This action is before the Court on Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motions for Transfer. ECF No. #23 . Plaintiff agrees to the proposed stay of proceedings. See ECF No. #26 . On consideration, the Court finds Defendants' unopposed motion should be GRANTED. Accordingly, all proceedings and deadlines in this case are stayed until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation has ruled on the pending motions for transfer and consolidation. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/17/2018. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
October 16, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #26 NOTICE Plaintiff's Consent to Moving Defendants' Motion to Stay by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY re #23 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motions for Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE Plaintiff's Consent to Moving Defendants' Motion to Stay by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY re #23 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motions for Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BURKE PICKREL, CARLA) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 AGREED MOTION By Defendants For An Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Until Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings (Dkt. #23 ). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2018. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
October 12, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #24 MOTION to Extend TimeAGREED Motion by Defendants for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Until Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings (Dkt. #23 ) (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Extend TimeAGREED Motion by Defendants for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Until Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings (Dkt. 23) by CHEMGUARD INC, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP. (YEARICK, GARTH) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
October 9, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #23 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motions for Transfer (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
October 5, 2018 Set Deadlines re #23 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motions for Transfer (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/19/2018). (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motions for Transfer by CHEMGUARD INC, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP. (PASS, ROBERT) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #21 , is GRANTED. Attorney M. Christina Sanchez, of the law firm of Baron & Budd, P.C., is admitted pro hac vice to represent the Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). (Appointed CRISTINA SANCHEZ for EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 09/25/2018. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
September 25, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4295138.) (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4295138.) by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (SANCHEZ, CRISTINA) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT CO's Agreed MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/19/2018. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/24/2018).) (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT CO. (VASIGH, MORGAN) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
September 19, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSE D RODGERS on behalf of BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT CO (RODGERS, JESSE) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #16 , is GRANTED. Attorney Jesse D. Rodgers, of the law firm of Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP, is admitted pro hac vice to represent the Defendant, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). (Appointed JESSE D RODGERS for BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT CO). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 09/17/2018. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jesse Daniel Rodgers.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4288266.) by BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT CO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-Jesse D. Rodgers) (RODGERS, JESSE) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
September 17, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jesse Daniel Rodgers.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4288266.) (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ZACHARY SANDMAN. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/7/2018. (sdw) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
September 7, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zachary Sandman.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4279334.) (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zachary Sandman.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4279334.) by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (SANDMAN, ZACHARY) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 3M COMPANY'S Agreed MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 09/06/2018. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to Complaint not filed earlier: 10/24/2018).) (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
September 6, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by 3M COMPANY. (BEALL, CHARLES) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of 3M COMPANY (BEALL, CHARLES) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting NATIONAL FOAM, INC'S Agreed #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond as to #1 Complaint until October 24, 2018. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 08/21/2018. (Answer due by 10/24/2018.) (MB)[Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
August 21, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by NATIONAL FOAM INC. (MOODY, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney, Carla Burke Pickrel, of the law firm Baron & Budd, P.C. to represent the Plaintiff. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/3/2018. (djb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carla Burke Pickrel.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4247007.) by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (BURKE PICKREL, CARLA) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
August 2, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carla Burke Pickrel.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4247007.) (djb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Consented to MOTION by Defendants TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS, LP AND CHEMGUARD, INC. FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 07/26/2018. (Answer due by 10/24/2018.) (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
July 26, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by CHEMGUARD INC, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP. (PASS, ROBERT) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT WAYNE PASS on behalf of CHEMGUARD INC, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP (PASS, ROBERT) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP (Attachments: #1 NATIONAL FOAM INC, #2 CHEMGUARD INC, #3 BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT CO, #4 3M COMPANY. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ODOM, BRADLEY) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT CO, CHEMGUARD INC, JOHN DOES 1 - 49, NATIONAL FOAM INC, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4212426.), filed by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (ODOM, BRADLEY) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/19/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY v. 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY
Represented By: CRISTINA SANCHEZ
Represented By: BRADLEY SYFRETT ODOM
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID SANDMAN
Represented By: Carla Burke Pickrel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1 - 49
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Represented By: MICHAEL HOWARD MOODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment CO
Represented By: JESSE D RODGERS
Represented By: STEFAN ALVAREZ
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: GARTH THOMAS YEARICK
Represented By: ROBERT WAYNE PASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: GEORGE RODERICK MEAD, II
Represented By: CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Represented By: Charles Franklin Beall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: GARTH THOMAS YEARICK
Represented By: ROBERT WAYNE PASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?