Andrews et al. v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al.
Plaintiff: Mario Scaduto, Jonathan Mall, Richard Tuttle, Carl Swenson, Joseph Carroll, Terence McKenna, Timothy Ippolito, William Gasparetti, John Thomas Bell, Robert Gallo, Robert Winslow, George Awad, Earl Eastwood, Edward Eshleman, Karl Millspaugh, Sean Davis, David Boswell, Dr. Christopher Hall, Brent Norman, Timothy Willis, Clinton Bonnett and Ian Andrews
Defendant: The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard Inc and National Foam Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv03521
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 7:18-cv-09178, Andrews et al. v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03521-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:18-cv-09178. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 20, 2018 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/18/2018) (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Letter, filed by 3M Company. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/17/2018) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Andrew J. Calica dated December 13, 2018 re: Advising the Court of the JPML Conditional Transfer Order. Document filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JPML Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit Transfer Order)(Calica, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jonathan Calica on behalf of 3M Company. (Calica, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 1, 2018 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 1, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
November 1, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:17-cv-07131-KMK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Chemguard, Inc.. Document filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P..(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint. Document filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-CV-07131, 17-CV-07134, 17-CV-07136, 18-CV-07057. Document filed by Tyco Fire Products L.P..(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Anne Armstrong on behalf of Tyco Fire Products L.P.. (Armstrong, Katherine) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of Orange. Case Number: EF009224-2018..Document filed by Tyco Fire Products L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- Order Denying Motion to Remand)(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 9, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 18cv7057. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 9, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 9, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Douglas E. Fleming, III, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 9, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Douglas E. Fleming, III to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 9, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Douglas E. Fleming, III to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Notice of Removal exhibits must be labeled pursuant to ECF Filing Rule 13.3. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 9, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Douglas E. Fleming, III. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Tyco Fire Products LP, 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 9, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Mario Scaduto, Timothy Willis, Terence McKenna, Chemguard, Inc., David Boswell, Karl Millspaugh, Robert Gallo, Richard Tuttle, Carl Swenson, Joseph Carroll, Timothy Ippolito, Clinton Bonnett, Sean Davis, Christopher Hall, William Gasparetti, National Foam, Inc., George Awad, Robert Winslow, Jonathan Mall, Edward Eshleman, 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co), John Thomas Bell, Earl Eastwood, Brent Norman added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by Mario Scaduto, Timothy Willis, Terence McKenna, Chemguard, Inc., David Boswell, Karl Millspaugh, Robert Gallo, Richard Tuttle, Carl Swenson, Joseph Carroll, Timothy Ippolito, Clinton Bonnett, Sean Davis, Christopher Hall, William Gasparetti, National Foam, Inc., George Awad, Robert Winslow, Jonathan Mall, Edward Eshleman, 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co), John Thomas Bell, Earl Eastwood, Brent Norman. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,.(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange, County of New York. Case Number: EF009224-2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15667530).Document filed by Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Rider to Civil Cover Sheet)(Fleming, Douglas) Modified on 10/9/2018 (pc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/20/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews et al. v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Scaduto
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Mall
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Tuttle
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Swenson
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Carroll
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terence McKenna
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Ippolito
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Gasparetti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Thomas Bell
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gallo
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Winslow
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Awad
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Eastwood
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Eshleman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Millspaugh
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Davis
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Boswell
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Christopher Hall
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Norman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Willis
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Bonnett
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Andrews
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Calica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Katherine Anne Armstrong
Represented By: Douglas E Fleming, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Douglas E Fleming, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?