McLean v. Vereen

Petitioner: William S McLean, Jr
Respondent: Wendell J Vereen
Case Number: 2:2018cv03600
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
0 Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
1 Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Produce by William S McLean, Jr. Response to Motion due by 3/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker. (hada, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 Letter from William S McLean, Jr (Captioned as Motion to take Notice). (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (hada, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 13 Order on MOTION to take Judicial Notice under Federal Rule of Evidence 201(c)(2), placed in U.S. Mail to William S McLean, Jr. (hada, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Petitioner has filed a motion asking the Court to take judicial notice that he sent Respondent a settlement offer. (Dkt. No. 12) The Court liberally interprets the motion as one under Rule 201(c)(2) of the Federal Rules of Evidence. The Court finds it inappropriate to take judicial notice. Rule 201 applies to notice of "adjudicative facts." It is questionable whether the purported fact at issue here is such a fact, but in any event, the Court may take judicial notice only of a fact that is "not subject to reasonable dispute," either because it is generally known or or because it can be accurately determined by sources whose accuracy cannot reasonably be questioned. Fed. R. Evid. 201(b). The fact here does not meet those criteria. Therefore, Petitioner's motion is denied. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 02/15/2019. (hada, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to take Judicial Notice under Federal Rule of Evidence 201(c)(2) by William S McLean, Jr. Response to Motion due by 2/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker. (hada, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Order 2241 Federal Habeas, Petition and Supplement, placed in U.S. Mail to U.S. Attorney General. (Certified Receipt# 7007 0220 0004 0679 2022). (hada, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, ORDER, #8 Order 2241 Federal Habeas, placed in U.S. Mail to William S McLean, Jr (hada, )
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REFERENCE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #7 Motion to Supplement #1 2241 petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 02/12/2019. (hada, )
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk. Apprising the respondent of deadline for filing dispositive motions and directing petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 02/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Supplement to Petition) (hada, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Supplement #1 2241 petition by William S McLean, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker. (hada, ) Modified to correct event type on 2/12/2019 (hada, ).
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by William S McLean, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker. (hada, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #3 Proper Form Order with required documents, placed in U.S. Mail to William S. McLean, Jr. (hada, )
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 2/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 01/29/2019. (hada, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by William S McLean, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLean v. Vereen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William S McLean, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wendell J Vereen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?