IPW Construction Group LLC v. Bhate Environmental Associates Inc et al
Plaintiff: IPW Construction Group LLC
Defendant: Bhate Environmental Associates Inc and Lexon Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00062
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Compel Arbitration: This case shall be stayed pending arbitration. The parties shall submit a joint status report every ninety days advising the Court on the status of the arbitration. The parties shall advise the court within ten (10) days after the arbitration award is issued, or the case is otherwise resolved, so that the case may be dismissed or judgment may be entered based on the arbitration award. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 2/21/2019.(vdru, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Hart Staples on behalf of Lexon Insurance Company (Staples, Christian)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Support re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay this Action Response filed by IPW Construction Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, William)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay this Action by Bhate Environmental Associates Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/20/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay this Action, #2 Exhibit A - Subcontract Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Demand for Arbitration)No proposed order.(Beaver, Ryan)
January 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPW Construction Group LLC. Lexon Insurance Company served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Scott, William)
January 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPW Construction Group LLC. Bhate Environmental Associates Inc served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Scott, William)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lexon Insurance Company. (vdru, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bhate Environmental Associates Inc. (vdru, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by IPW Construction Group LLC.(vdru, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bhate Environmental Associates Inc, Lexon Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8197890.), filed by IPW Construction Group LLC. Service due by 4/8/2019. (vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IPW Construction Group LLC v. Bhate Environmental Associates Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhate Environmental Associates Inc
Represented By: Ryan Lee Beaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexon Insurance Company
Represented By: Christian Hart Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IPW Construction Group LLC
Represented By: William A Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?