Tidwell v. Genesis Bankcard Services Inc et al

Plaintiff: Lindy Tidwell
Defendant: Genesis Financial Solutions, Genesis Bankcard Services Inc and Genesis FS Card Services
Case Number: 2:2019cv00118
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Lindy Tidwell. Refiled to correct event type. (jbry, )
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Genesis Bankcard Services Inc answer due 2/28/2019; Genesis Financial Solutions answer due 2/28/2019. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 2/7/2019.(jbry, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Genesis Bankcard Services Inc, Genesis Financial Solutions. Response to Motion due by 2/20/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Echols, Chad)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Genesis Bankcard Services Inc, Genesis Financial Solutions. (jbry, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lindy Tidwell.(jbry, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Genesis Bankcard Services Inc, Genesis Financial Solutions ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8209154.), filed by Lindy Tidwell. Service due by 4/15/2019(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tidwell v. Genesis Bankcard Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Financial Solutions
Represented By: Chad Vinson Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Bankcard Services Inc
Represented By: Chad Vinson Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis FS Card Services
Represented By: Chad Vinson Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindy Tidwell
Represented By: Penny Hays Cauley
Represented By: William Kyle Geddings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?