Oppenheimer v. Century 21 Properties Plus et al
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Defendant: Century 21 Properties Plus and Deborah Cromer
Case Number: 2:2019cv00303
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/22/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/8/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 5/8/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/3/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/8/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/9/2019, Discovery due by 12/4/2019, Motions in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 12/16/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 2/1/2020, ADR Statement due by 12/31/2019, Mediation Due by 1/31/2020, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 4/1/2019.(jbry, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Century 21 Properties Plus, Deborah Cromer.(Haller, David)
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David K Haller on behalf of Century 21 Properties Plus, Deborah Cromer (Haller, David)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by David Oppenheimer. Century 21 Properties Plus served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Deborah Cromer served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Jefferson, Meliah)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #5 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright to U.S. Copyright Office (jbry, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright placed in U.S. Mail to U.S. Copyright Office (jbry, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (jbry, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Century 21 Properties Plus, Deborah Cromer. (jbry, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David Oppenheimer.(jbry, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Century 21 Properties Plus, Deborah Cromer ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8247155.), filed by David Oppenheimer. Service due by 5/2/2019(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppenheimer v. Century 21 Properties Plus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century 21 Properties Plus
Represented By: David K Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Cromer
Represented By: David K Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?