Yanney v. Delta Air Lines Inc
Plaintiff: James Yanney
Defendant: Delta Air Lines Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00343
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Jay S Masty for September 17, 2019 through October 9, 2019 (Masty, Jay)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO CONDUCT MEDIATION Mediation Due by 11/6/2019 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/13/2019. (sshe, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/15/2019,, Rule 26 Report due by 4/15/2019,, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/8/2019,, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/7/2019,, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/8/2019,, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/15/2019,, Discovery due by 10/6/2019,, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection,, Motions due by 10/20/2019,, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection,, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection,, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 1/1/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/13/2019. (sshe, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by James Yanney.(Masty, Jay)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 26(f) Report by James Yanney. (Attachments: #1 Mediation of Cases Pending Before Judge Gergel, #2 Proposed Order Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Masty, Jay)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/28/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/14/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 3/14/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/8/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/7/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/8/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/15/2019, Discovery due by 8/6/2019, Motion in Limine due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 8/20/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 11/1/2019 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 2/7/2019. (sshe, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Delta Air Lines Inc.(Bruce, James)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Delta Air Lines Inc.(sshe, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-10-6020. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8253199), filed by Delta Air Lines Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yanney v. Delta Air Lines Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines Inc
Represented By: James Stephen Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Yanney
Represented By: Jay S Masty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?