Terracon Consultants Inc v. Insight Group LLC et al

Plaintiff: Terracon Consultants Inc
Defendant: Insight Group LLC, William Christopher, Jr and Ryan Keiper
Case Number: 2:2019cv00396
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/4/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/18/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 4/18/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/12/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/12/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/12/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/19/2019, Discovery due by 9/10/2019, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 9/24/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 1/1/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/14/2019. (sshe, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by William Christopher, Jr, Insight Group LLC, Ryan Keiper.(Rannik, Jaan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 19 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Richard M Gergel. Judge Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by William Christopher, Jr, Insight Group LLC, Ryan Keiper.(Rannik, Jaan)
March 7, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by William Christopher, Jr, Insight Group LLC, Ryan Keiper.(Rannik, Jaan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: The Hearing on the MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order set for Monday, 3/4/2019 is CANCELLED. The parties have resolved the issue and a Consent Order has been filed. (vdru, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT ORDER re #3 Motion for TRO: The Parties have consented to the entry of a preliminary injunction. Details set forth in order. The parties shall update the Court regarding their discovery efforts within 60 days. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 3/4/2019.(vdru, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER denying #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Entered at the direction of the Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 3/1/2019. (nsw)
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Jennifer H. Thiem. (Thiem, Jennifer)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by William Christopher, Jr, Insight Group LLC, Ryan Keiper. Response to Motion due by 3/14/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Epting, Andrew)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Terracon Consultants Inc re 7 Notice of Hearing on Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Thiem, Jennifer)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terracon Consultants Inc. William Christopher, Jr served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Thiem, Jennifer)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terracon Consultants Inc. Ryan Keiper served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Thiem, Jennifer)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terracon Consultants Inc. Insight Group LLC served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Thiem, Jennifer)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for Monday, 3/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #2, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks. (vdru, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to William Christopher, Jr, Insight Group LLC, Ryan Keiper. (vdru, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Terracon Consultants Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A: Affidavit of Judy Smith, #3 Exhibit B: Terracon CPT Log, #4 Exhibit C: Insight CPT Log, #5 Exhibit D: Christopher Acknowledgement, #6 Exhibit E: Keiper Acknowledgement, #7 Exhibit F: E-Manual & Policy). No proposed order.(vdru, ) (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/28/2019) (vdru, ). Modified to replace Exhibit A with correct document per filer's request on 2/28/2019 (vdru, ).
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Terracon Consultants Inc.(vdru, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Christopher, Jr, Insight Group LLC, Ryan Keiper ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8263263.), filed by Terracon Consultants Inc. Service due by 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: E-Manual & Policy, #2 Exhibit B: Terracon CPT Log, #3 Exhibit C: Insight CPT Log). (vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terracon Consultants Inc v. Insight Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Group LLC
Represented By: Jaan Gunnar Rannik
Represented By: Andrew Kenneth Epting, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Christopher, Jr
Represented By: Jaan Gunnar Rannik
Represented By: Andrew Kenneth Epting, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Keiper
Represented By: Jaan Gunnar Rannik
Represented By: Andrew Kenneth Epting, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terracon Consultants Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Hess Thiem
Represented By: John Whitney McGreevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?