Mitigation Solutions Corporation LLC v. Elder Construction Inc et al

Plaintiff: Mitigation Solutions Corporation LLC
Defendant: Elder Construction Inc and Elder Construction KY Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00397
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/28/2019. (jbry, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from J. Blanton O'Neal, IV. (O'Neal, J)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants shall have until April 3, 2019 to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/13/2019.(jbry, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable David C Norton. Judge Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Elder Construction Inc, Elder Construction KY Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(O'Neal, J)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John O'Connor Radeck, Jr on behalf of Elder Construction Inc, Elder Construction KY Inc (Radeck, John)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by J Blanton O'Neal, IV on behalf of Elder Construction Inc, Elder Construction KY Inc (O'Neal, J)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Elder Construction KY Inc. (vdru, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Elder Construction Inc. (vdru, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mitigation Solutions Corporation LLC.(vdru, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elder Construction Inc, Elder Construction KY Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8263262.), filed by Mitigation Solutions Corporation LLC. Service due by 5/13/2019. (vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitigation Solutions Corporation LLC v. Elder Construction Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elder Construction Inc
Represented By: John O'Connor Radeck, Jr
Represented By: J Blanton O'Neal, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elder Construction KY Inc
Represented By: John O'Connor Radeck, Jr
Represented By: J Blanton O'Neal, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitigation Solutions Corporation LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Alexander Traywick
Represented By: Alexandra Scott Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?