Oppenheimer v. Fuller et al

Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Defendant: American Real Estate Capital Company LLC, Brothers Property Corporation, Brothers Property Management Corporation and Victor L Fuller
Case Number: 2:2019cv00409
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE by David Oppenheimer. Brothers Property Management Corporation waiver executed on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons on Brothers Property Management)(Jefferson, Meliah)
March 28, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE by David Oppenheimer. Brothers Property Corporation waiver executed on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons on Brothers Property Corporation)(Jefferson, Meliah)
March 28, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE by David Oppenheimer. American Real Estate Capital Company LLC waiver executed on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons on American Real Estate Capital)(Jefferson, Meliah)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 Amended Summons Issued as to Brothers Property Management Corporation. (vdru, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Oppenheimer. Brothers Property Corporation served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Brothers Property Corporation)(Jefferson, Meliah)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is ordered that Dana A. LeJune who represents Plaintiff David Oppenheimer is granted admission pro hac vice in this case. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 2/19/2019.(vdru, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dana A. LeJune ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8272060) by David Oppenheimer. Response to Motion due by 2/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission PHV of LeJune, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Dana Andrew Lejune, #3 Courts Admitted and in Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Jefferson, Meliah)
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #9 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright to US Copyright Office. (vdru, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (vdru, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Victor L Fuller. (vdru, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Brothers Property Management Corporation. (vdru, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Brothers Property Corporation. (vdru, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Real Estate Capital Company LLC. (vdru, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David Oppenheimer.(vdru, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Real Estate Capital Company LLC, Brothers Property Corporation, Victor L Fuller ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8266584.), filed by David Oppenheimer. Service due by 5/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Original Photo No. 1, #2 Exhibit 2: Original Photo No. 2, #3 Exhibit 3: Original Photo No. 3, #4 Exhibit 4: Certificate of Registration, #5 Exhibit 5: Infringing Images, #6 Exhibit 6: Cease and Desist Letter)(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppenheimer v. Fuller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Represented By: Dana Andrew Lejune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Real Estate Capital Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brothers Property Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brothers Property Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor L Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?