Slivka et al v. Bosch Thermotechnology Corp et al

Plaintiff: Gene R Slivka
Defendant: XYZ Companies 1-5, Bosch Thermotechnology Corp and Robert Bosch LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00455
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/4/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/9/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/10/2020, Discovery due by 5/11/2020, Motion in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 5/25/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/15/2020, Pretrial Briefs due seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection, Jury Selection Deadline 8/3/2020, ADR Statement due by 5/31/2020, Mediation Due by 6/30/2020, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 4/9/2019. (jbry, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Bosch Thermotechnology Corp, Robert Bosch LLC.(Smythe, Henry)
April 8, 2019 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Gene R Slivka(Individually), Gene R Slivka(as Trustee of SLIVKA FAMILY CHILDRENS TRUST).(Akins, Dale)
April 8, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Gene R Slivka(Individually), Gene R Slivka(as Trustee of SLIVKA FAMILY CHILDRENS TRUST).(Akins, Dale)
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 Rule 26(f) Report by Gene R Slivka(Individually), Gene R Slivka(as Trustee of SLIVKA FAMILY CHILDRENS TRUST).(Akins, Dale)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Bosch Thermotechnology Corp, Robert Bosch LLC. (Smythe, Henry)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gene R Slivka(Individually), Gene R Slivka(as Trustee of SLIVKA FAMILY CHILDRENS TRUST).(Akins, Dale)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion by Patrick T. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/12/2019.(jbry, )
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion by George Thomas Major, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/12/2019.(jbry, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick T. O'Connor ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8315242) by Gene R Slivka(Individually), Gene R Slivka(as Trustee of SLIVKA FAMILY CHILDRENS TRUST). Response to Motion due by 3/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Akins, Dale)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by George Thomas Major, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8315161) by Gene R Slivka(Individually), Gene R Slivka(as Trustee of SLIVKA FAMILY CHILDRENS TRUST). Response to Motion due by 3/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Akins, Dale)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/22/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/8/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 4/8/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/3/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/7/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/8/2019, Discovery due by 11/4/2019, Motions in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 11/15/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 1/1/2020, ADR Statement due by 11/29/2019, Mediation Due by 12/31/2019, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/1/2019. (jbry, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Bosch Thermotechnology Corp, Robert Bosch LLC. (Smythe, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gene R Slivka(as Trustee of SLIVKA FAMILY CHILDRENS TRUST), Gene R Slivka(Individually). Robert Bosch LLC served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Akins, Dale)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gene R Slivka(as Trustee of SLIVKA FAMILY CHILDRENS TRUST), Gene R Slivka(Individually). Bosch Thermotechnology Corp served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Akins, Dale)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bosch Thermotechnology Corp, Robert Bosch LLC.(jbry, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Colleton County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-15-00067. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8273675), filed by Bosch Thermotechnology Corp, Robert Bosch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Process and Pleadings, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Adam Wienner)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slivka et al v. Bosch Thermotechnology Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Companies 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bosch Thermotechnology Corp
Represented By: Henry Buist Smythe, Jr
Represented By: Matthew E Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Represented By: Henry Buist Smythe, Jr
Represented By: Matthew E Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene R Slivka
Represented By: Dale Ernest Akins
Represented By: George Thomas Major, Jr
Represented By: Patrick T O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?