WB Music Corp et al v. North Charleston Hospitality Group LLC et al

Plaintiff: Who Wants to Buy My Publishing, Songs of Black River, Duke of Earle, WB Music Corp, I Love Pizza Music, Rehits Music, Music of the Corn, Heavy Metal Disco and Lorimar Music A Corp
Defendant: Sam Mustafa and North Charleston Hospitality Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00559
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to North Charleston Hospitality Group LLC (jbry, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sam Mustafa. (vdru, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendant Sam Mustafa byDuke of Earle, Heavy Metal Disco, I Love Pizza Music, Lorimar Music A Corp, Music of the Corn, Rehits Music, Songs of Black River, WB Music Corp, Who Wants to Buy My Publishing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service of Process on Sam Mustafa, #2 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default as to Sam Mustafa)(Jefferson, Meliah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendant North Charleston Hospitality Group LLC byDuke of Earle, Heavy Metal Disco, I Love Pizza Music, Lorimar Music A Corp, Music of the Corn, Rehits Music, Songs of Black River, WB Music Corp, Who Wants to Buy My Publishing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SC SOS Business Entity Search NCHG LLC, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process served by SC Secretary of State, #3 Exhibit C - Articles of Organization - NCHG LLC, #4 Affidavit in Support of Request for Default Against NCHG LLC)(Jefferson, Meliah)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Who Wants to Buy My Publishing, Lorimar Music A Corp, I Love Pizza Music, Music of the Corn, WB Music Corp, Duke of Earle, Heavy Metal Disco, Rehits Music, Songs of Black River. Sam Mustafa served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Process on Sam Mustafa)(Jefferson, Meliah)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Who Wants to Buy My Publishing, Lorimar Music A Corp, I Love Pizza Music, Music of the Corn, WB Music Corp, Duke of Earle, Heavy Metal Disco, Rehits Music, Songs of Black River. North Charleston Hospitality Group LLC served on 3/19/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Service of Process served by SC Secretary of State)(Jefferson, Meliah)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #5 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright to the US Copyright Office (sshe, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WB Music Corp et al v. North Charleston Hospitality Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Who Wants to Buy My Publishing
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Black River
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duke of Earle
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WB Music Corp
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I Love Pizza Music
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rehits Music
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Music of the Corn
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heavy Metal Disco
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorimar Music A Corp
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Mustafa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Charleston Hospitality Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?