Johns et al v. Allura USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donna Johns and Pamela Jean Frick
Defendant: Allura USA LLC, Plycem USA Inc, Plycem USA LLC, Elementia USA Inc and Elementia SA de CV
Case Number: 2:2019cv01036
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 66 REPLY to Response to Motion re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II-V of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Response filed by Elementia SA de CV, Elementia USA Inc, Plycem USA LLC. (Brathwaite, Ashley)
April 9, 2019 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration Response filed by Elementia SA de CV, Elementia USA Inc, Plycem USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Frick home purchase agreement)(Brathwaite, Ashley)
April 9, 2019 Filing 64 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response filed by Elementia SA de CV, Elementia USA Inc, Plycem USA LLC. (Brathwaite, Ashley)
April 9, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE to Attorneys regarding MDL Transfer (jbry, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 62 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Western; Case Number 3:18-cv-00669. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 8, 2019 Case electronically transferred to District of South Carolina. Original electronic file and docket sheet sent. (tmg) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 61 Transfer Order of Judicial Panel MDL transferring case to District of South Carolina, MDL# 2886. Matter transferred for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (tmg) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying without prejudice #59 Joint Motion to Extend Case Management Order Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/4/19. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 59 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Pamela Jean Frick, Donna Johns. Responses due by 4/15/2019 (Harris, Scott). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration by Pamela Jean Frick, Donna Johns. Replies due by 3/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Donna Johns, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Pamela Jean Frick, #3 Exhibit Purchase Agreements, #4 Exhibit 2014-2016 Allura Warranty, #5 Exhibit Trademark Booklet, #6 Exhibit 2016-2019 Plycem Warranty, #7 Exhibit Letter from Nick Bacon, #8 Appendix Unreported Cases)(Harris, Scott) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Pamela Jean Frick, Donna Johns. Replies due by 3/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Elementia Management Discussion & Analysis, #2 Exhibit Elementia CertainTeed Press Release, #3 Exhibit CertainTeed Plant Announcement, #4 Exhibit Tribstar Article, #5 Exhibit Extract of Def. Memo Opp. Transfer, #6 Exhibit Allura Trademark, #7 Exhibit Elementia Annual Report 2016, #8 Exhibit Elementia Divisions, #9 Appendix Unreported Case)(Harris, Scott) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II-V of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Pamela Jean Frick, Donna Johns. Replies due by 3/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unreported Cases)(Harris, Scott) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #38 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration, #41 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II-V of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including March 22, 2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Defendants' deadlines for reply briefs in support of their motions to dismiss are extended to and including April 9, 2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/13/19. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 54 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Documents No. 36, 38, and 41 by Pamela Jean Frick, Donna Johns. Responses due by 3/27/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harris, Scott). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying #35 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Pending Ruling On Plaintiff Shara Guinns Motion To Transfer Actions To The Southern District Of Ohio Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1407 For Coordinated Or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/11/19. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Support re #35 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Plaintiff Shara Guinn's Motion to Transfer Actions to the Southern District of Ohio by Pamela Jean Frick, Donna Johns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harris, Scott) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION for Hearing ON DEF MOTION TO DISMISS IN FAVOR OF ARBITRATION by Pamela Jean Frick, Donna Johns. Replies due by 3/8/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Harris, Scott) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Plaintiff Shara Guinn's Motion to Transfer Actions to the Southern District of Ohio by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC. Replies due by 3/6/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. February 19, 2019 MDL filing, #2 Proposed Order)(Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 49 DELETED DOCUMENT - REFILED AS DOCUMENT 50 (brl) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Notice to Harper T. Segui: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 3/6/2019. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Harper T. Segui is hereby admitted pro hac to represent Plaintiffs Donna Johns and Pamela Jean Frick. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/27/19. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Harper T. Segui Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3953234. by Pamela Jean Frick, Donna Johns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harris, Scott). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #38 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration, #41 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II-V of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs responses due by 3/15/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail Defendants' replies due by 4/2/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/26/19. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 45 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration, #41 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II-V of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #40 MOTION for Hearing by Pamela Jean Frick, Donna Johns. Responses due by 3/11/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harris, Scott). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Filing of Declaration by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC re #38 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nick Bacon)(Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #40 MOTION for Hearing. Responses due by 3/1/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (brl) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 43 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint by Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC.(Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II-V of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC. (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II-V of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC. Responses due by 3/1/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Herrington, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Callaway)(Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Preliminary Hearing re: #38 Motion to Dismiss, Request for Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC. Responses due by 3/1/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. (Brathwaite, Ashley) Modified event on 2/19/2019 (brl). [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support re #38 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC. (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC. Responses due by 3/1/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Herring, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Callaway, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Brathwaite)(Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Elementia, S.A. de C.V.. (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Elementia, S.A. de C.V.. Responses due by 3/1/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kramer)(Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Plaintiff Shara Guinn's Motion to Transfer Actions to the Southern District of Ohio by Pamela Jean Frick, Donna Johns. Responses due by 2/27/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Shara Guinn's Motion to Transfer Actions to the Southern District of Ohio, #2 Exhibit Unreported Cases)(Harris, Scott). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan : Estimated Trial Time: 14 days. Discovery due by 11/6/2019. Motions due by 12/4/2019. Mediation deadline set for 11/20/2019. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/12/19. (clc) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Notice to Brian H. Callaway: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/11/2019. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Brian H. Callaway is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/4/19. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Notice to Leah Greenberg Katz: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/11/2019. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Leah Greenberg Katz is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/4/19. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Notice to Anthony Vale: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/11/2019. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Anthony Vale is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/4/19. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Notice to Robert L. Hickok: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/11/2019. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Robert L. Hickok is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/4/19. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 29 Transfer Motion filed before the Judicial Panel MDL, Plaintiff Shara Guinn's Motion to transfer for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings to the Southern District of Ohio filed by Attorney William F. Cash, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter)(tob) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs, filed by Donna Johns, Pamela Jean Frick.(Harris, Scott) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brian H. Callaway Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3927722. by Allura USA LLC, Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC, Plycem USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brathwaite, Ashley). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Leah Greenberg Katz Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3927716. by Allura USA LLC, Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC, Plycem USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brathwaite, Ashley). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Anthony Vale Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3927713. by Allura USA LLC, Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC, Plycem USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brathwaite, Ashley). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert L. Hickok Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3927697. by Allura USA LLC, Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC, Plycem USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brathwaite, Ashley). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2), #13 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration, #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Plaintiffs Response due by 2/25/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Defendants Reply due by 3/15/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/23/19. (tob) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motions To Dismiss by Pamela Jean Frick, Donna Johns. Responses due by 2/5/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harris, Scott). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC.(Brathwaite, Ashley) Modified on 1/15/2019 to remove filer (tmg). [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC. (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Shawn Herrington re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC. (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Ashley Brathwaite re #13 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration filed by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Shawn Herrington re #13 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration filed by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) by Elementia, S.A. de C.V.. (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) of Juan Francisco Sanchez Kramer filed by Elementia, S.A. de C.V. (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) by Elementia, S.A. de C.V.. Responses due by 1/28/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting with modification #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants shall have up to and including January 14, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/18/18. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Allura USA LLC, Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC, Plycem USA, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. State Notice of Filing)(Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Allura USA LLC, Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC, Plycem USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brathwaite, Ashley). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brl) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Joseph) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elementia, S.A. de C.V. (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elementia USA, Inc. (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plycem USA LLC d/b/a Allura (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite on behalf of All Defendants (Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Union County Superior Court, case number 18 CVS 02955. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3889245), filed by Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC d/b/a Allura, Allura USA LLC, Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B. Allura Limited Warranty)(Brathwaite, Ashley) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 4/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johns et al v. Allura USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allura USA LLC
Represented By: Anthony Vale
Represented By: Robert L Hickok
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Represented By: Brian H. Callaway
Represented By: Joseph D. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA Inc
Represented By: Anthony Vale
Represented By: Robert L Hickok
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Represented By: Brian H. Callaway
Represented By: Joseph D. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA LLC
Represented By: Anthony Vale
Represented By: Robert L Hickok
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Represented By: Brian H. Callaway
Represented By: Joseph D. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementia USA Inc
Represented By: Anthony Vale
Represented By: Robert L Hickok
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Represented By: Brian H. Callaway
Represented By: Joseph D. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementia SA de CV
Represented By: Anthony Vale
Represented By: Robert L Hickok
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Represented By: Brian H. Callaway
Represented By: Joseph D. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Johns
Represented By: Harper Todd Segui
Represented By: Scott Crissman Harris
Represented By: Daniel Kent Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Jean Frick
Represented By: Harper Todd Segui
Represented By: Scott Crissman Harris
Represented By: Daniel Kent Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?