Naas v. Charleston County School District et al

Plaintiff: Joseph E Naas
Defendant: Joseph Williams and Charleston County School District, .
Case Number: 2:2019cv01341
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Charleston County School District, Joseph Williams.(Sandifer, Kassi)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Charleston County School District, Joseph Williams.(Sandifer, Kassi)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Filing. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service)(Kobrovsky, Lawrence) (Main Document 10 replaced on 6/12/2019, was filed as attachment) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/12/2019, was filed as main document) (hada, ).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/18/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/2/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 7/2/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/23/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/22/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/23/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/23/2019, Discovery due by 11/22/2019, Motions due by 1/21/2020, Mediation Due by 12/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 05/28/2019. (hada, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joseph Williams.(Sandifer, Kassi)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Charleston County School District.(Sandifer, Kassi)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Joseph Williams.(Sandifer, Kassi)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Charleston County School District.(Sandifer, Kassi)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Charleston County School District, Joseph Williams. (hada, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joseph E Naas.(hada, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charleston County School District, Joseph Williams ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8432101.), filed by Joseph E Naas. Service due by 8/6/2019 (hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naas v. Charleston County School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Williams
Represented By: Kassi B Sandifer
Represented By: David Leon Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston County School District, .
Represented By: Kassi B Sandifer
Represented By: David Leon Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph E Naas
Represented By: Lawrence Craig Kobrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?