Kinard v. Arby's Restaurant Group Inc

Plaintiff: Ronda Kinard
Defendant: Arby's Restaurant Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01350
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bristow Marchant
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 16 Reason: refiled as entry #17 . (egra, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Arby's Restaurant Group Inc. (Fox, Kristen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Ronda Kinard.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/2/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff text with Director Pamela Mooneyham re inconsistent policy and arbitrary enforcement. (Ronda Kinard v. Arby's Restaurant Group), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Civil judgment in favor of Church's Chicken against Drayton in the amount of 186724.81 against Christopher Drayton for Breach of Termination Contract and Slander of Church's Chicken (Ronda Kinard v. Arby's Restaurant Group).pdf, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Arby's ARB Code of Business Conduct As posted on company website (Ronda Kinard v. Arby's Restaurant Group).pdf, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Example of Plaintiff Kinards text to Director Pamela Mooneyham re PTO and hardship requesting time off (Ronda Kinard v. Arby's Restaurant Group).pdf, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Christopher Drayton text communication to Plaintiff Kinard to change an employees time sheet (Ronda Kinard v. Arby's Restaurant Group).pdf, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - An example of Plaintiff Kinard requesting PTO and hardship getting approval from Drayton (Ronda Kinard v. Arby's Restaurant Group).pdf)(Cobb, Hal)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Arby's Restaurant Group Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/18/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished decisions)(Fox, Kristen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Arby's Restaurant Group Inc. Response to Motion due by 6/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Affidavit of Katie Raber, #3 Unpublished decisions)No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Fox, Kristen)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ronda Kinard. Response to Motion due by 6/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Cobb, Hal)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arby's Restaurant Group Inc, filed by Ronda Kinard. Service due by 8/26/2019 (Cobb, Hal)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in the Scheduling Order, ECF No. 5, and all other Federal and Local Civil Rule disclosure and conference requirements are hereby stayed pending resolution of ARG's Motion for Partial Dismissal, ECF No. 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 05/23/2019. (egra, )
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 05/23/2019. (egra, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay re #5 Scheduling Order, by Arby's Restaurant Group Inc. Response to Motion due by 6/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Fox, Kristen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brett E. Coburn ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8457233) by Arby's Restaurant Group Inc. Response to Motion due by 6/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit/Application of Brett Coburn, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Fox, Kristen)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/6/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/20/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 6/20/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/11/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/12/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/12/2019, Discovery due by 11/12/2019, Motions due by 1/13/2020, Mediation Due by 12/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 05/17/2019. (egra, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies by Arby's Restaurant Group Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/29/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Cited unpublished decisions)No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Fox, Kristen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Arby's Restaurant Group Inc. (egra, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-cp-1733. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 2:19-cv-1350-DCN-BM), filed by Arby's Restaurant Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service) (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinard v. Arby's Restaurant Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda Kinard
Represented By: Hal Eugene Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arby's Restaurant Group Inc
Represented By: Kristen Willoughby Fox
Represented By: Brett Eric Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?