Kiawah Island Utility Inc v. Westport Insurance Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Kiawah Island Utility Inc
Defendant: Westport Insurance Corporation, Lloyd's Syndicate 1882 CHB, Mears Group Inc and Swiss Re International SE
Case Number: 2:2019cv01359
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Response to Motion due by 7/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/26/2019.(jbry, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 29 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mears Group Inc.(Wooten, Patrick)
June 25, 2019 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss by Kiawah Island Utility Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Duffy, Brian)
June 25, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mears Group Inc.(Wooten, Patrick)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion by William Garrett Zieden-Weber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/25/2019.(jbry, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Garrett Zieden-Weber ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8522886) by Westport Insurance Corporation. Response to Motion due by 7/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application / Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Wall, Susan)
June 25, 2019 Filing 24 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Westport Insurance Corporation.(Wall, Susan)
June 25, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Westport Insurance Corporation. Response to Motion due by 7/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Wall, Susan)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #18 MOTION to Stay Response to Motion due by 7/16/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/24/2019.(eric, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Response to Motion due by 7/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/24/2019.(eric, ) Modified on 6/25/2019 to correct linkage to #10 Motion to Dismiss (jbry, ).
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Stay by Kiawah Island Utility Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Duffy, Brian)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss by Kiawah Island Utility Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Duffy, Brian)
June 18, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay by Lloyd's Syndicate 1882 CHB, Swiss Re International SE. Response to Motion due by 7/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Ralephata, Nosizi) (Main Document 18 replaced on 6/19/2019) (jbry, ). Modified on 6/19/2019 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/17/2019.(jbry, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 Additional Attachments to Main Document #10 MOTION to Dismiss . First attachment description: Rule 7.05(C) Authority - Direct benefit estoppel . (Ralephata, Nosizi)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Myles Allen Parker ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8505828) by Lloyd's Syndicate 1882 CHB, Swiss Re International SE. Response to Motion due by 6/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Ralephata, Nosizi)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erin Doctor Guyton ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8505769) by Lloyd's Syndicate 1882 CHB, Swiss Re International SE. Response to Motion due by 6/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Ralephata, Nosizi) (Main Document 13 replaced on 6/18/2019) (jbry, ). Modified on 6/18/2019 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user(jbry, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Donald Scott Murray ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8505758) by Lloyd's Syndicate 1882 CHB, Swiss Re International SE. Response to Motion due by 6/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Ralephata, Nosizi) (Main Document 12 replaced on 6/18/2019) (jbry, ). Modified on 6/18/2019 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lloyd's Syndicate 1882 CHB, Swiss Re International SE.(Ralephata, Nosizi)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Lloyd's Syndicate 1882 CHB, Swiss Re International SE. Response to Motion due by 6/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit Table of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit EX 1 - Mears Policy, #4 Exhibit EX 2 - 2019-03-08 Order, #5 Exhibit EX 3 - 2018-02-26 - 2018-03-08 Emails, #6 Exhibit EX 4 - 2018-03-12 Letter, #7 Exhibit EX 5 - 2018-09-21 Letter, #8 Exhibit EX 6 - J. Post Declaration, #9 Exhibit EX 7 - Chubb Co Details - PRA Fin Services Register, #10 Exhibit EX 8 - Mears Answers to Interrogatories, #11 Exhibit EX 9 - Texas Secretary of State Details - Quanta Services)No proposed order.(Ralephata, Nosizi) Modified on 6/17/2019 to create linkage to #15 Additional Attachments filed 6/14/2019(jbry, ).
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion by Carl Joseph Spindler to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #8 Motion by Joseph Leonard Luciana, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 5/23/2019.(jbry, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Leonard Luciana, III ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8460481) by Kiawah Island Utility Inc. Response to Motion due by 6/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Duffy, Brian)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carl Joseph Spindler ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8460384) by Kiawah Island Utility Inc. Response to Motion due by 6/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Duffy, Brian)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Kiawah Island Utility Inc. Mears Group Inc served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Duffy, Brian)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mears Group Inc. (jbry, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lloyd's Syndicate 1882 CHB, Swiss Re International SE, Westport Insurance Corporation. (jbry, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kiawah Island Utility Inc.(jbry, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8435781.), filed by Kiawah Island Utility Inc. Service due by 8/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Westport Property Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit B Builder's Risk Insurance Policy, #3 Exhibit C Service of Suit Clause, #4 Exhibit D Construction Contract Insurance Provisions, #5 Exhibit E Certificate of Liability Insurance, #6 Exhibit F Complaint in Mears Lawsuit)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiawah Island Utility Inc v. Westport Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westport Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Susan Taylor Wall
Represented By: William Garrett Zieden-Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd's Syndicate 1882 CHB
Represented By: Nosizi Ralephata
Represented By: Donald Scott Murray
Represented By: Myles Allen Parker
Represented By: Erin Doctor Guyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mears Group Inc
Represented By: Patrick Coleman Wooten
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swiss Re International SE
Represented By: Nosizi Ralephata
Represented By: Donald Scott Murray
Represented By: Myles Allen Parker
Represented By: Erin Doctor Guyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiawah Island Utility Inc
Represented By: Brian C Duffy
Represented By: Blake Abernethy McKie
Represented By: Carl Joseph Spindler
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Luciana, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?