Connor v. United Life Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jay Connor
Defendant: Baltimore Life Insurance Company, The, Securus Direct Life, LLC and United Life Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01431
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 29 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #28 Order Dismissing Case(60 Day Settlement Order), placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Jay Connor 215 East Bay Street 201 F Charleston, SC 29401 (jbry, )
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/28/2019. (jbry, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order by Baltimore Life Insurance Company, The (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kelchner, John)
June 26, 2019 Filing 25 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 23 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Jay Connor 215 East Bay Street 201 F Charleston, SC 29401 (hada, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER. On information and belief, this case has settled. The parties are instructed to file a joint stipulation of dismissal by July 8, 2019, or let the Court know if a different response is required. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 6/26/19. (akob, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 22 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 21 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, placed in U.S. Mail to Jay Connor 215 East Bay Street 201 F Charleston, SC 29401 (hada, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, in light of the circumstances described in the motion. Defendant Baltimore Life Insurance Company's Answer is due by June 27, 2019. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 6/12/19.(akob, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 20 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 18 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, placed in U.S. Mail to Jay Connor 215 East Bay Street 201 F Charleston, SC 29401 (hada, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Baltimore Life Insurance Company, The. Response to Motion due by 6/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Kelchner, John)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Securus Direct Life, LLC answer is due 6/24/2019; United Life Services, LLC answer is due 6/24/2019. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no further extensions will be granted for this deadline. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 6/11/19.(akob, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United Life Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hayes, Dean)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Securus Direct Life, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hayes, Dean)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Securus Direct Life, LLC, United Life Services, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Hayes, Dean)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, placed in U.S. Mail to Jay Connor 215 East Bay Street 201 F Charleston, SC 29401 from Charleston Division. (hada, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Jay Connor at 215 East Bay Street 201 F, Charleston, SC 29401 from Charleston Division. (hada, )
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff, a pro se litigant, is directed to submit fully completed and signed answers to the Court's interrogatories pursuant to Local Civil Rule 26.01 (D.S.C.), which are attached to this order, within twenty-one days from the date this order is entered (plus three days for mail time). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 06/05/2019. (Attachments: #1 Answers to the Court's interrogatories pursuant to Local Civil Rule 26.01)(hada, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Charleston County. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment from State Court, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kelchner, John)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Baltimore Life Insurance Company's Answer is due by June 14, 2019.Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 6/5/19.(akob, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Baltimore Life Insurance Company, The. Response to Motion due by 6/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Kelchner, John)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, placed in U.S. Mail to Jay Connor 215 East Bay Street 201 F Charleston, SC 29401 (egra, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Baltimore Life Insurance Company's Answer is due by June 6, 2019. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 5/20/19.(akob, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Baltimore Life Insurance Company, The. Response to Motion due by 6/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Kelchner, John)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Baltimore Life Insurance Company, The re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories (Kelchner, John)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Baltimore Life Insurance Company, The, Securus Direct Life, LLC, United Life Services, LLC.(hada, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019CV1010600519. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8447807), filed by Baltimore Life Insurance Company, The, Securus Direct Life, LLC, United Life Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Consent to Removal)(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connor v. United Life Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Life Insurance Company, The
Represented By: John B Kelchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securus Direct Life, LLC
Represented By: John B Kelchner
Represented By: Dean Anthony Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Life Services, LLC
Represented By: John B Kelchner
Represented By: Dean Anthony Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?