Alcantara v. Allstate Crane Rental Inc
Plaintiff: Noel E Alcantara
Defendant: Allstate Crane Rental Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01546
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bristow Marchant
Referring Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/29/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/12/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/2/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/2/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/4/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/4/2019, Discovery due by 1/3/2020, Motions due by 3/3/2020, Mediation Due by 2/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 07/08/2019. (egra, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Allstate Crane Rental Inc.(Blackburn, Cherie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Allstate Crane Rental Inc.(Blackburn, Cherie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Cause of Action by Allstate Crane Rental Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/16/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination)No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Blackburn, Cherie)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Noel E Alcantara. (egra, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Allstate Crane Rental Inc. Service due by 8/27/2019. (egra, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allstate Crane Rental Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8469745.), filed by Noel E Alcantara. Service due by 8/27/2019. (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcantara v. Allstate Crane Rental Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel E Alcantara
Represented By: Jarrel L Wigger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Crane Rental Inc
Represented By: Cherie Wilson Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?