Sawyer v. Tidelands Health ASC, LLC
Plaintiff: Carole Ann Sawyer
Defendant: Tidelands Health ASC, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01612
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bristow Marchant
Referring Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/7/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/21/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/21/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/11/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/11/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/11/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/11/2019, Discovery due by 1/10/2020, Motions due by 3/11/2020, Mediation Due by 2/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 07/17/2019. (egra, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tidelands Health ASC, LLC.(Bright, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tidelands Health ASC, LLC.(Bright, Thomas)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carole Ann Sawyer. (egra, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tidelands Health ASC, LLC. Service due by 9/3/2019. (egra, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tidelands Health ASC, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8484990.), filed by Carole Ann Sawyer. Service due by 9/3/2019. (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawyer v. Tidelands Health ASC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Ann Sawyer
Represented By: Marybeth E Mullaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tidelands Health ASC, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Allen Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?