Southern Industrial Contractors LLC v. O'Brien and Gere Inc of North America et al
Plaintiff: Southern Industrial Contractors LLC
Defendant: O'Brien and Gere Inc of North America, JWA Cast House LLC and Western Surety Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01691
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Western Surety Company. (sshe, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against O'Brien and Gere Inc of North America, Western Surety Company, filed by Southern Industrial Contractors LLC. Service due by 10/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Mechanic's Lien, #2 Exhibit Notice of Bond, #3 Summons Summons to Western Surety) (Hagood, H)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Roy Cohen and #7 Motion for Michael Metz-Topodas to Appear Pro Hac Vice for O'Brien and Gere Inc of North America. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/3/2019.(sshe, ) Modified docket text for misspelling on 7/8/2019 (sshe, ).
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Metz-Topodas ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8539542) by O'Brien and Gere Inc of North America. Response to Motion due by 7/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Admission PHV, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Stnd)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Haldrup, Neil)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Roy Cohen ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8539492) by O'Brien and Gere Inc of North America. Response to Motion due by 7/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application for Admission PHV, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Stnd)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Haldrup, Neil) Modified docket text for misspelling on 7/8/2019 (sshe, ).
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Southern Industrial Contractors LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Legal Description)(Hagood, H)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JWA Cast House LLC, O'Brien and Gere Inc of North America. (sshe, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Southern Industrial Contractors LLC.(sshe, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8501765.), filed by Southern Industrial Contractors LLC. Service due by 9/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Amended Mechanic's Lien, #2 Exhibit B Payment Demand)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Industrial Contractors LLC v. O'Brien and Gere Inc of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Industrial Contractors LLC
Represented By: James A Bruorton, IV
Represented By: H Brewton Hagood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Brien and Gere Inc of North America
Represented By: Neil S Haldrup
Represented By: Roy S Cohen
Represented By: Michael I Metz-Topodas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JWA Cast House LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?