Recchia v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Albert Recchia
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Record
Case Number: 2:2019cv01709
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service Due 09/26/2019. (cpeg, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robertson H Wendt, Jr on behalf of Albert Recchia (Wendt, Robertson) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/2/2019) (cpeg, ).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REFERENCE #6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 06/19/2019.(cpeg, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, with required documents placed in U.S. Mail to Albert Recchia 4149 Hunting Bow Trail Myrtle Beach, SC 29579. (cpeg, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 7/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 06/19/2019. (cpeg, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Albert Recchia. Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker. (egra, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, Social Security Administration Record Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Albert Recchia. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents) (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Recchia v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Recchia
Represented By: Robertson H Wendt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?