Seltzer v. Squires et al

Plaintiff: Alan M Seltzer
Defendant: Tidewater Surgical Group, MD Gregory T Squires, MD Darryl Pauls and East Cooper Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2019cv01712
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Brandon Hess on behalf of East Cooper Medical Center (Hess, Chad)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/16/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/30/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/30/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/24/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/25/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/23/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/30/2019, Discovery due by 1/22/2020, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 2/5/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 5/4/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/26/2019. (sshe, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Houston Foppiano on behalf of Darryl Pauls (Foppiano, Charles)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Darryl Pauls.(Lee, Randolph)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gregory T Squires, Tidewater Surgical Group.(Craig, Molly)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gregory T Squires, Tidewater Surgical Group.(Craig, Molly)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alan M Seltzer.(sshe, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8505451.), filed by Alan M Seltzer. Service due by 9/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dr. Kleinman, #2 Affidavit of Dr. Lee)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seltzer v. Squires et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tidewater Surgical Group
Represented By: Brian Edward Johnson
Represented By: Molly Hood Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Gregory T Squires
Represented By: Brian Edward Johnson
Represented By: Molly Hood Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Darryl Pauls
Represented By: Randolph Lucius Lee
Represented By: Charles Houston Foppiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Cooper Medical Center
Represented By: Chad Brandon Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan M Seltzer
Represented By: Deloris King Cromartie
Represented By: James Edward Bell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?