County Of Westchester v. United States Of America et al

Plaintiff: County Of Westchester
Defendant: National Foam Inc, John Does 1-10, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Angus Fire Armour Corporation, State of New York, United States Air National Guard Bureau, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., United Technologies Corporation, Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., New York Air National Guard, United States of America, United States Air Force, The 3M Company, Chubb Fire, Ltd., United States Department of Defense, Kidde PLC, Inc., Chemguard Inc and Tyco Fire Products LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv01724
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 42 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 7:19-cv-04847, County Of Westchester v. United States Of America et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-1724-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 4 govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 6/21/2019 9:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 41 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:19-cv-04847. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 17, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/12/2019) (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 31, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 31, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:18-cv-07057-KMK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 39 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Air Force. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 38 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Air Force, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Henry Riddle Chen to RE-FILE Document No. #21 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; the docket entry must reflect the names of all the parties as to whom the summons is being requested. The wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; These parties were previously issued a summons. If you require a new summons, you must request an Amended Summons. Please include the word "Amended" on the summons PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chubb Fire, Ltd.. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Foam, Inc.. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Angus Fire Armour Corporation. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Angus International Safety Group, Ltd.. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kidde PLC Inc.. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United Technologies Corporation. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chemguard, Inc.. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Buckeye Fire Equipment Company. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tyco Fire Products, L.P.. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The 3M Company. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York Air National Guard. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Of New York. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Air National Guard Bureau. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Defense. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to See attached Annex, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Attachments: #1 Annex)(Chen, David) Modified on 5/29/2019 (dnh). [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Chen to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the As To party name does not match the name on the summons. The full name of the party must be added to the docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 18cv7057. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Henry Riddle Chen. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Henry Riddle Chen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co), Angus Fire Armour Corporation, Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., Chubb Fire, Ltd., Department of Defense, JOHN DOES 1-10 (names and number of whom are unknown at present), Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC Inc., National Foam, Inc., New York Air National Guard, STATE OF NEW YORK, Tyco Fire Products L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Air Force, United States Air National Guard Bureau, United Technologies Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of David H. Chen re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-7057 (KMK). Document filed by County Of Westchester.(Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chubb Fire, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Foam, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Angus Fire Armour Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kidde PLC, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United Technologies Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chemguard, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tyco Fire Products, LP, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The 3M Company, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York Air National Guard, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to State of New York, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Air Force, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) Modified on 5/28/2019 (gp). Modified on 5/28/2019 (gp). [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Air National Guard Bureau, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Defense, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co), Angus Fire Armour Corporation, Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., Chubb Fire, Ltd., Department of Defense, JOHN DOES 1-10 (names and number of whom are unknown at present), Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC Inc., National Foam, Inc., New York Air National Guard, STATE OF NEW YORK, Tyco Fire Products L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Air Force, United States Air National Guard Bureau, United Technologies Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16950524)Document filed by County Of Westchester. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 'A' - Airport Map)(Chen, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County Of Westchester v. United States Of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus Fire Armour Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Air National Guard Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus International Safety Group, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Air National Guard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Fire, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County Of Westchester
Represented By: David Henry Riddle Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?