Urban Nirvana LLC v. Selective Way Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Urban Nirvana LLC
Defendant: Selective Way Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01730
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/3/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/17/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 9/17/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/12/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/11/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/10/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/17/2020, Discovery due by 2/10/2020, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 2/24/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 6/1/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/13/2019. (sshe, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Selective Way Insurance Company.(Calamari, Robert)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Selective Way Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 8/15/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Calamari, Robert)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C Calamari on behalf of Selective Way Insurance Company (Calamari, Robert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 5 Reason: Attorney refiled with corrected signature document and to correct event type Corrected Filing Document Number #6 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 6/28/2019 (sshe, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Urban Nirvana LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter accepting service of complaint)(Kefalos, George) Modified to correct date filed on 7/2/2019 (sshe, ).
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Selective Way Insurance Company. (sshe, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Urban Nirvana LLC.(sshe, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Selective Way Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8508033.), filed by Urban Nirvana LLC. Service due by 9/16/2019(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Urban Nirvana LLC v. Selective Way Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Way Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert C Calamari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Urban Nirvana LLC
Represented By: George J Kefalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?