Smith et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Vanessa Sullivan, Robert Harriman, Nancy Ann Williams, Daniel Yoder, Jill Cwiklik, Doctor Robert Williams, Jeff Reed, Anthony Deblaise, Lorrie Hodgdon, Katie Tsigounis, Benjamin Burke, Robert Williams, Jr, Richard Reynolds, Robinson Smith, Charles Badger, Patricia Dublin, Jonathan Rose, Renee Gauthier, William Dublin, Jason Boufford and Mary Kathryn Rendall
Defendant: National Foam Inc, Chubb National Foam, 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Chemgard Inc and EI DuPont de Nemours and Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01746
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Counsel should prepare and submit a proposed order in Word document format for any Motion to Withdraw as Attorney via email to chambers at gergel_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Napoli Plaintiffs. Response to Motion due by 8/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Affidavit Paul J. Napoli Declaration, # 3 Redline version proposed Amended Complaint(s) to be added)No proposed order.(Napoli, Paul) Refiled corrected documents provided/verified by filing user correctly in management case and spread to all applicable member case(s), per Judge's filing instructions. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Hood Craig on behalf of EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, E I E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, E I Du Point De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company LLC, EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI Du Pont de Nemours & Co, EI Du Pont de Nemours and Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Craig, Molly)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D Carpenter on behalf of EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, E I E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, E I Du Point De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company LLC, EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI Du Pont de Nemours & Co, EI Du Pont de Nemours and Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Carpenter, Andrew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of Charles Badger, Jason Boufford, Benjamin Burke, Jill Cwiklik, Anthony Deblaise, Patricia Dublin, William Dublin, Renee Gauthier, Robert Harriman, Lorrie Hodgdon, Jeff Reed, Mary Kathryn Rendall, Richard Reynolds, Jonathan Rose, Robinson Smith, Vanessa Sullivan, Katie Tsigounis, Nancy Ann Williams, Robert Williams, Robert Williams, Jr, Daniel Yoder Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01746-RMG(Lanciotti, Patrick)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tate J Kunkle on behalf of Charles Badger, Jason Boufford, Benjamin Burke, Jill Cwiklik, Anthony Deblaise, Patricia Dublin, William Dublin, Renee Gauthier, Robert Harriman, Lorrie Hodgdon, Jeff Reed, Mary Kathryn Rendall, Richard Reynolds, Jonathan Rose, Robinson Smith, Vanessa Sullivan, Katie Tsigounis, Nancy Ann Williams, Robert Williams, Robert Williams, Jr, Daniel Yoder Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01746-RMG(Kunkle, Tate)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New Hampshire, 1:19-cv-00560, Smith et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-1746-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 4 govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 6/21/2019 9:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New Hampshire; Case Number 1:19-cv-00560. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 18, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (jb) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 6/19/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER MDL FINAL ORDER case is transferred to District of South Carolina for proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407. MDL-2873. (jb) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 6/19/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemgard, Inc., E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company, National Foam, Inc., The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C., Tyco Fire Products L.P.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 6/19/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motion for pro hac vice admission of Tate J. Kunkle, Esq. has been received. Unless said motion with the required fee is filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 6/28/2019. (ej) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 6/19/2019.]
May 29, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 6/19/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by All Plaintiffs (Vogelman, Lawrence) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 6/19/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-560-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 6/19/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1818590 filed by Richard Reynolds, Jeff Reed, Daniel Yoder, Nancy Ann Williams, Jonathan Rose, Robinson Smith, Robert Harriman, Charles Badger, Renee Gauthier, William Dublin, Robert Williams, Jill Cwiklik, Lorrie Hodgdon, Katie Tsigounis, Anthony Deblaise, Vanessa Sullivan, Jason Boufford, Robert Jr. Williams, Benjamin Burke, Mary Kathryn Rendall, Patricia Dublin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses)(Vogelman, Lawrence) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 6/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb National Foam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: Andrew D Carpenter
Represented By: Molly Hood Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Represented By: Molly Hood Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemgard Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EI DuPont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: Andrew D Carpenter
Represented By: Molly Hood Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Sullivan
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Harriman
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Ann Williams
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Yoder
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Cwiklik
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doctor Robert Williams
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Reed
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Deblaise
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorrie Hodgdon
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Tsigounis
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Burke
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Williams, Jr
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Reynolds
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robinson Smith
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Badger
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Dublin
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Rose
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Gauthier
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dublin
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Boufford
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kathryn Rendall
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?