Simmons v. Charleston County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Lamont Simmons
Defendant: Joseph Stokes and Charleston County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 2:2019cv01754
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referring Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 Defendants' Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Charleston County Sheriff's Office, Joseph Stokes.(Jackson, Robin)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT Rule 26(f) Report by Charleston County Sheriff's Office.(Jackson, Robin) Modified on 8/13/2019 to edit docket text as requested by filing user (egra, ).
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Charleston County Sheriff's Office. (Jackson, Robin)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Lamont Simmons.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/5/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Peper, Mark)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/7/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/21/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/21/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/11/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/11/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/11/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/11/2019, Discovery due by 1/10/2020, Motions due by 3/11/2020, Mediation Due by 2/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 07/17/2019. (egra, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Joseph Stokes.(Jackson, Robin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Charleston County Sheriff's Office, Joseph Stokes. Response to Motion due by 7/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Jackson, Robin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 5 Acceptance of Service Reason: Filed using incorrect ECF user ID. (hada, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Lamont Simmons. (hada, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lamont Simmons. (egra, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Charleston County Sheriff's Office, Joseph Stokes. Service due by 9/17/2019. (egra, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charleston County Sheriff's Office, Joseph Stokes ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8513789.), filed by Lamont Simmons. Service due by 9/17/2019. (egra, ) (Main Document 1 replaced with corrected case number on the document on 6/20/2019) (hada, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Charleston County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Stokes
Represented By: Robin Lilley Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Robin Lilley Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont Simmons
Represented By: Mark A Peper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?