Samuel v. U.S. Department of State
Plaintiff: Robert T Samuel, III
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Case Number: 2:2019cv01786
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert T Samuel, III. Re-served Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Envelope) (egra, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert T Samuel, III. U.S. Department of State served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Envelope) (egra, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Summons Issued as to USA, #8 Order Service - Non-Inmate placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Robert T Samuel, III P.O. Box 32311 Charleston, SC 29417 (egra, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of State. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 10/10/2019. (egra, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 07/12/2019. (egra, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert T Samuel, III.(hada, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of State ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX200016462.), filed by Robert T Samuel, III. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samuel v. U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert T Samuel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?