Hendricks v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Penny A Hendricks
Defendant: Davol Inc, C R Bard Inc, John Doe 1-5 and Jane Doe 1-5
Case Number: 2:2019cv01815
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred to Southern Ohio per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 34. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list.. (jbry, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Stay by C R Bard Inc, Davol Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/7/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Hegler, Adam)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Berkeley County. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Acknowledgment of Notice of Removal signed by Clerk of Court)(Hegler, Adam)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by C R Bard Inc, Davol Inc.(jbry, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Berkeley County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-08-00657. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8527838), filed by Davol Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendricks v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny A Hendricks
Represented By: Lynn Seithel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davol Inc
Represented By: James F Rogers
Represented By: Adam Jesse Hegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: James F Rogers
Represented By: Adam Jesse Hegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?