American National Bank v. Rice et al
Plaintiff: American National Bank
Defendant: Iron Bottom Enterprises LLC and William Rice, Jr
Case Number: 2:2019cv01854
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/20/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/3/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 9/3/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/28/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/27/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/27/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/3/2020, Discovery due by 1/27/2020, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 2/10/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Trial Deadline on or after 5/4/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/30/2019. (sshe, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Iron Bottom Enterprises LLC, William Rice, Jr. (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers)(Payne, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by American National Bank. William Rice, Jr served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Barfield, Kenneth) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/16/2019) (sshe, ). Modified on 7/16/2019 to replace with corrected signature document provided by filing user(sshe, ).
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by American National Bank. Iron Bottom Enterprises LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Barfield, Kenneth) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/16/2019) (sshe, ). Modified on 7/16/2019 to replace with corrected signature document provided by filing user(sshe, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by American National Bank. Service due by 9/30/2019 (Barfield, Kenneth)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American National Bank.(sshe, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8532197.), filed by American National Bank. Service due by 9/26/2019(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American National Bank v. Rice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American National Bank
Represented By: Diane Summers Clarke, II
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Barfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iron Bottom Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Michael Chase Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Rice, Jr
Represented By: Michael Chase Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?