Church Creek Construction LLC et al v. Mt Hawley Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Mims, Lavonia Mitchell, Norma F Callen, Church Creek Construction LLC, Joshua Sears, Kevin Molony, Mepkin Place Homeowners Association LLC, Andrew Blalock, Farzan Soodavar, Ben Yaschik, Mary Gray, Eric Crotts, Patrick J Mallard, Robert P Ledford, Jr, Jane F Mitchell, Nicholas Hargreaves, Linda McMillan, Avina Adamivat, Julius McMillan, Martin Yaschik, S Emory Bull Hiott, Kelly Blalock, Larry Elsey and Stephanie Slan
Defendant: Insurance Office of America Inc, Wood Special Risk Brokers LLC and Mt Hawley Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01877
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Wood Special Risk Brokers LLC answer due 9/5/2019. (Maluchnik, Crystal)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response to Motion due by 9/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 8/14/2019.(eric, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response to Motion due by 9/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 8/8/2019.(eric, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Mepkin Place Homeowners Association LLC. Response to Motion due by 8/21/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Howe, Gedney)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Mepkin Place Homeowners Association LLC. Response to Motion due by 8/21/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Howe, Gedney)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mepkin Place Homeowners Association LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ltr to Mt. Hawley Insurance Company serving Summons, Complaint and Answers to Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B - Ltr to Insurance Office of America, Inc. serving Summons, Complaint and Answers to 26.01 Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C - Ltr to Wood Special Risk Brokers LLC serving Summons, Complaint and Answers to 26.01 Interrogatories)(Howe, Gedney)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Mt Hawley Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 8/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(DuPre, Allen)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael BT Wilkes on behalf of Insurance Office of America Inc (Wilkes, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Insurance Office of America Inc.(Atkinson, Charles)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Insurance Office of America Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Brief - Second Amended Complaint, filed in 2:17-cv-01339-DCN)No proposed order.(Atkinson, Charles) Modified on 7/29/2019 to add description to exhibit (jbry, ).
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Daniel Atkinson on behalf of Insurance Office of America Inc (Atkinson, Charles)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to Wood Special Risk Brokers LLC. (jbry, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbry, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Avina Adamivat, Andrew Blalock, Kelly Blalock, Norma F Callen, Eric Crotts, Mary Gray, Nicholas Hargreaves, S Emory Bull Hiott, Robert P Ledford, Jr, Patrick J Mallard, Julius McMillan, Linda McMillan, Mepkin Place Homeowners Association LLC, Christopher Mims, Jane F Mitchell, Lavonia Mitchell, Joshua Sears, Stephanie Slan, Farzan Soodavar, Ben Yaschik, Martin Yaschik.(jbry, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8534695.), filed by Martin Yaschik, Patrick J Mallard, Mepkin Place Homeowners Association LLC, Linda McMillan, Andrew Blalock, Stephanie Slan, Kelly Blalock, Norma F Callen, Jane F Mitchell, Mary Gray, Eric Crotts, Nicholas Hargreaves, Ben Yaschik, Robert P Ledford, Jr, Julius McMillan, Lavonia Mitchell, Farzan Soodavar, Joshua Sears, Avina Adamivat, S Emory Bull Hiott, Christopher Mims. Service due by 9/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order of Judgment, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment of Claims Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - insurance declaration pages and insuring agreements, #4 Exhibit D - Ltr to counsel for Mt. Hawley)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church Creek Construction LLC et al v. Mt Hawley Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Mims
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavonia Mitchell
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma F Callen
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church Creek Construction LLC
Represented By: Thomas Bacot Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Sears
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Molony
Represented By: Thomas Bacot Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mepkin Place Homeowners Association LLC
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Blalock
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farzan Soodavar
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Yaschik
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Gray
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Crotts
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick J Mallard
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert P Ledford, Jr
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane F Mitchell
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Hargreaves
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda McMillan
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avina Adamivat
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius McMillan
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Yaschik
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S Emory Bull Hiott
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Blalock
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Elsey
Represented By: Thomas Bacot Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Slan
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Represented By: Gedney M Howe, III
Represented By: Daniel Scott Slotchiver
Represented By: Ivon Keith McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Office of America Inc
Represented By: Michael BT Wilkes
Represented By: Charles Daniel Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood Special Risk Brokers LLC
Represented By: Crystal L Maluchnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By: Allen Leland DuPre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?