DuBose v. Scout Boats, Inc.
Plaintiff: Meagan Paige DuBose
Defendant: Scout Boats, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01907
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/5/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/6/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/6/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/6/2020, Discovery due by 3/6/2020, Motions due by 5/5/2020, Mediation Due by 4/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 08/19/2019. (egra, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Scout Boats, Inc..(Williams, Amanda)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Scout Boats, Inc..(Williams, Amanda)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Scout Boats, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Amanda)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Meagan Paige DuBose.(Ricker, Brice)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/2/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/16/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/16/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/6/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/7/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/6/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/6/2019, Discovery due by 1/6/2020, Motions due by 3/6/2020, Mediation Due by 2/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 07/12/2019. (egra, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Charleston County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Notice of Removal)(Williams, Amanda)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Scout Boats, Inc..(Williams, Amanda)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Scout Boats, Inc..(hada, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dorchester Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019CP1800976. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8539940), filed by Scout Boats, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DuBose v. Scout Boats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meagan Paige DuBose
Represented By: Brice E Ricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scout Boats, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Coney Williams
Represented By: Stacy K Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?