Knapp v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Plaintiff: Allison A Knapp
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest and Pinnacle Bank
Case Number: 2:2019cv01969
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4001
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 Amended MOTION to Strike #13 First MOTION to Strike #5 Amended Complaint (Jury Trial Demand), #5 Amended Complaint (Jury Trial Demand) Response filed by Allison A Knapp.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/19/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Kefalos, George)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint (Amended Complaint - ECF 5) by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers)(Groves, Stephen)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 Amended MOTION to Strike #13 First MOTION to Strike #5 Amended Complaint (Jury Trial Demand), #5 Amended Complaint (Jury Trial Demand) by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. Response to Motion due by 9/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Groves, Stephen)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION to Strike #5 Amended Complaint (Jury Trial Demand) by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. Response to Motion due by 9/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Groves, Stephen)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Second Cause of Action and All Non-Recoverable Damage Claims) by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. Response to Motion due by 9/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Groves, Stephen)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/13/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/27/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 9/27/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/21/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/23/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/20/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/27/2020, Discovery due by 2/19/2020, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 3/4/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Trial Deadline on or after 6/1/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/23/2019. (sshe, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Pinnacle Bank.(Altman, Samuel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Pinnacle Bank.(Altman, Samuel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Allison A Knapp. Pinnacle Bank served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acceptance of Service)(Kefalos, George)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Pinnacle Bank. (sshe, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Allison A Knapp. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Acceptance of Service)(Kefalos, George)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pinnacle Bank, filed by Allison A Knapp. Service due by 10/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended, #2 LR 26.01 Answers Amended) (Kefalos, George)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (sshe, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Allison A Knapp.(sshe, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8555568.), filed by Allison A Knapp. Service due by 10/15/2019(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knapp v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Stephen P Groves, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Bank
Represented By: Samuel H Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison A Knapp
Represented By: George J Kefalos
Represented By: John T Gentry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?