Williams v. Harris Ventures, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amy Williams
Defendant: Harris Ventures, Inc. and Layton Construction Company LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02048
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Layton Construction Company LLC. (Dixon, Joshua)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Harris Ventures, Inc.. (Ozment, Matthew)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Amy Williams.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/11/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge Form)(Ricker, Brice)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Amy Williams.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/10/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge Form)(Ricker, Brice) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/4/2019 with document provided by filing user) (dsto)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Layton Construction Company LLC.(Dixon, Joshua)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Layton Construction Company LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-EEOC Charges, #2 Exhibit B-EEOC Notice of Dismissal of Charges and Right to Sue)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Dixon, Joshua) Modified on 8/20/2019 to edit text. (dsto)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Harris Ventures, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Ozment, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2019: #2 Exhibit A Charge of Discrimination to EEOC) (sshe, ). Modified on 8/20/2019 to add attachment, inadvertently not included with original filing, as request and provided by filing user(sshe, ).
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Time is extended until August 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/26/2019.(dsto, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (with Consent) by Layton Construction Company LLC. Response to Motion due by 8/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Dixon, Joshua)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/24/2019.(dsto, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Evan M. Rosen ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8573598) by Harris Ventures, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 8/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing for Evan M. Rosen, #3 Proposed Order)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Ozment, Matthew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Dorchester County. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Confirmation of Receipt by Dorchester County Clerk of Court)(Ozment, Matthew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Harris Ventures, Inc..(dsto, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dorchester County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-18-1179. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8569729), filed by Harris Ventures, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Harris Ventures, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Williams
Represented By: Brice E Ricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Randall Ozment
Represented By: Evan M Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Layton Construction Company LLC
Represented By: Joshua Wallace Dixon
Represented By: Victoria Therese Kepes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?