Green v. George Sink PA Injury Lawyers et al
Plaintiff: Ray Green
Defendant: Laura Jones, Katie French, George Sink PA Injury Lawyers and Amy Erkman
Case Number: 2:2019cv02063
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Charleston County. (Cherry, Molly)
September 17, 2019 Filing 25 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Amy Erkman, Katie French, George Sink PA Injury Lawyers, Laura Jones.(Cherry, Molly)
September 17, 2019 Filing 24 Rule 26(f) Report by Amy Erkman, Katie French, George Sink PA Injury Lawyers, Laura Jones.(Cherry, Molly)
September 3, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laura Jones re #21 Reply to Response to Motion Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss (Cherry, Molly)
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) and Memorandum of Law in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss Response filed by Laura Jones. (Cherry, Molly)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) and Memorandum of Law in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss. Response filed by Ray Green.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #18 Roseboro Order w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Ray Green, 4747 Lambs Road, Apt. 21J, North Charleston, SC, 29418 (dsto, )
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Partial Motion. Response to Motion due by 9/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 08/26/2019. (dsto)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amy Erkman, Katie French re #13 Notice of Joinder, #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Partial Motion, #15 Answer to Complaint (Cherry, Molly)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Amy Erkman, Katie French.(Cherry, Molly)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Partial Motion by Amy Erkman, Katie French. Response to Motion due by 9/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Cherry, Molly)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal, and Consent to Removal by Molly Hughes Cherry on behalf of Amy Erkman, Katie French (Attachments: #1 Exhibit August 6, 2019 Correspondence)(Cherry, Molly)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #11 Conference and Scheduling Order w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Ray Green, 4747 Lambs Road, Apt. 21J, North Charleston, SC, 29418 (dsto, )
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/3/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/17/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 9/17/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/12/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/10/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/9/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/9/2020, Discovery due by 3/9/2020, Motions due by 4/24/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/8/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 8/3/2020, ADR Statement due by 4/24/2020, Mediation Due by 5/26/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to August 3, 2020.Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 08/12/2019. (dsto, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #9 Roseboro Order w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Ray Green, 4747 Lambs Road, Apt. 21J, North Charleston, SC, 29418 (dsto, )
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to #7 MOTION to Dismiss. Response to Motion due by 8/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/26/2019. (dsto, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by George Sink PA Injury Lawyers, Laura Jones.(Cherry, Molly)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) and Memorandum of Law in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss by Laura Jones. Response to Motion due by 8/7/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Cherry, Molly)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #5 Order to Notify of Address Change placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Ray Green, 4747 Lambs Road, Apt. 21J, North Charleston, SC, 29418 (dsto, )
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/24/2019. (dsto, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by George Sink PA Injury Lawyers, Laura Jones.(dsto, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-10-2391. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8572994), filed by Laura Jones, George Sink PA Injury Lawyers. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. George Sink PA Injury Lawyers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Jones
Represented By: Melissa Fried Spence
Represented By: Cheryl H Ledbetter
Represented By: Molly Hughes Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie French
Represented By: Melissa Fried Spence
Represented By: Cheryl H Ledbetter
Represented By: Molly Hughes Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Sink PA Injury Lawyers
Represented By: Melissa Fried Spence
Represented By: Cheryl H Ledbetter
Represented By: Molly Hughes Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Erkman
Represented By: Melissa Fried Spence
Represented By: Cheryl H Ledbetter
Represented By: Molly Hughes Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?