Singleton v. The State of South Carolina et al
Petitioner: Michael A Singleton
Respondent: The State of South Carolina and The Commonwealth of PA
Case Number: 2:2019cv02064
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael A Singleton placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Michael A Singleton 344630 Lackawanna County Prison 1371 North Washington Avenue Scranton, PA 18509 (hada, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker. It is recommended that #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael A Singleton be summarily dismissed without prejudice and that a certificate of appealability be denied. Objections to R&R due by 9/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 09/11/2019. (hada, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Michael A Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(hada, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTIONS by Michael A Singleton to #3 Proper Form Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hada, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #3 Proper Form Order with required documents, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Michael A Singleton 344630 Lackawanna County Prison 1371 North Washington Avenue Scranton, PA 18509 (hada, )
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 8/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 08/01/2019. (hada, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael A Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton v. The State of South Carolina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael A Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The State of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Commonwealth of PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?