MRP Properties Company, LLC v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: MRP Properties Company, LLC
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, The Chemours Company, National Foam Inc, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Doe Defendants 1 to 20, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company and 3M Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02196
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by R Steven DeGeorge on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, The Chemours Company LLC, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company, The, Chemours Company, The Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(DeGeorge, R)
October 4, 2019 Filing 23 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. An AMENDED COMPLAINT is to be filed in the member case only. When this document adds new defendant parties not currently listed as a party on the member case docket, the attorney filing user is to add each New Party, at the time of filing. ECF will prompt with "Please select the party that this filing is against"; the attorney filing user should choose to add each New Party and Select the Party at that time. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by David R Erickson on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co., E I Du Point De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, EI Du Pont de Nemours & Co, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, EI Du Pont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Erickson, David)
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T Richardson on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Richardson, Matthew)
October 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lucille Dinkins on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dinkins, Mary)
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice W Parham Casey on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Casey, Alice)
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Moylan, III on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Moylan, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Reply briefs are discouraged in the District of South Carolina, and any reply brief shall be submitted within seven (7) days of service of the responsive brief. Local Rule 7.07 D.S.C. Absent specific extenuating circumstances, the Court will not grant a motion, opposed or on consent, for an extension to file a reply brief. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MRP Properties Company, LLC. Buckeye Fire Equipment Company served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Black, John)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MRP Properties Company, LLC. (Black, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MRP Properties Company, LLC. National Foam Inc served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Black, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MRP Properties Company, LLC. 3M Company served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019; EI DuPont de Nemours and Company served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019; Kidde-Fenwal Inc served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019; The Chemours Company served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Black, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M Cox on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, The Chemours Company LLC, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company, The, Chemours Company, The Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cox, Stephen)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John DS Gilmour on behalf of MRP Properties Company, LLC, Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02192-RMG, 2:19-cv-02196-RMG(Gilmour, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Jackson on behalf of MRP Properties Company, LLC, Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02192-RMG, 2:19-cv-02196-RMG(Jackson, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, National Foam Inc, The Chemours Company. (sshe, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Michigan Eastern, 1:19-cv-12149, MRP Properties Company, LLC v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-2196-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 5 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 9/6/2019 9:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-12149. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Transfer to the District of South Carolina for MDL 2873. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/7/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-16) to District of South Carolina for MDL # 2873. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/7/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-16) for MDL # 2873. [Informational Copy] (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/7/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Ferroli on behalf of MRP Properties Company, LLC. (Ferroli, John) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/7/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John David Black appearing on behalf of MRP Properties Company, LLC (Black, John) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/7/2019.]
July 23, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/7/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Gratiot County Circuit Court, case number 2019-0321-NP. Receipt No: 0645-7333595 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court for the District of South Carolina Charleston Division, 2:18-mm-2873-RMG, Judge Richard Mark Gergel] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Cases) (Infante, Joseph) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MRP Properties Company, LLC v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: R Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Stephen M Cox
Represented By: David R Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1 to 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EI DuPont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: John C Moylan, III
Represented By: Alice W Parham Casey
Represented By: Matthew T Richardson
Represented By: David R Erickson
Represented By: Mary Lucille Dinkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Joseph Infante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MRP Properties Company, LLC
Represented By: John David Black
Represented By: Fred J. Fresard
Represented By: John A. Ferroli
Represented By: William J Jackson
Represented By: John DS Gilmour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?