Ridgewood Water v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: RIDGEWOOD WATER
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, National Foam Inc, JOHN DOES 1-50, Tyco Fire Products LP, The Chemours Company, Honeywell International Inc, 3M Company and Chemguard Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv02198
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 45 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. An AMENDED COMPLAINT is to be filed in the member case only. When this document adds new defendant parties not currently listed as a party on the member case docket, the attorney filing user is to add each New Party, at the time of filing. ECF will prompt with "Please select the party that this filing is against"; the attorney filing user should choose to add each New Party and Select the Party at that time. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by David R Erickson on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co., E I Du Point De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, EI Du Pont de Nemours & Co, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, EI Du Pont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Erickson, David)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER This Order Relates to Case No. 2:19-cv-02198-RMG. Ridgewood Water's motion to remand (Dkt. No. (264) in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (36) in case 2:19-cv-02198-RMG) is DENIED. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/1/2019.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02198-RMG(sshe, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Reply briefs are discouraged in the District of South Carolina, and any reply brief shall be submitted within seven (7) days of service of the responsive brief. Local Rule 7.07 D.S.C. Absent specific extenuating circumstances, the Court will not grant a motion, opposed or on consent, for an extension to file a reply brief. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 40 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 40 (original) Reason: Attorney refiled corrected document (see Dkt. No. 41 refiled/modified by clerk) Filing date of original filing: 9/24/2019 (sshe, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re (264 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 36 in 2:19-cv-02198-RMG) MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by RIDGEWOOD WATER. (Edling, Matthew) ***Refiled correctly in management case and spread to applicable member case(s), per Judge's filing instructions. Clerk instructs attorney filing user to file correctly for all future filings.*** Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02198-RMG(sshe, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re (264 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 36 in 2:19-cv-02198-RMG) MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/24/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Connor Declaration)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02198-RMG(Kitts, Amanda)
September 10, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirby D Shealy, III on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02198-RMG(Shealy, Kirby)
September 3, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Remand to State Court by RIDGEWOOD WATER. Response to Motion due by 9/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Affidavit of Matthew K. Edling, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Affidavit of David Terry)No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02198-RMG(Edling, Matthew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 35 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New Jersey, 2:19-cv-09651, Ridgewood Water v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-2198-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 5 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 9/6/2019 9:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 34 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:19-cv-09651. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of South Carolina. (MDL 2873 Judge Richard M. Gergel) (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER: The parties shall file a joint status letter by 8/6/19 updating the Court on the status of Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate the JPML's conditional transfer order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/30/19. (jbb) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MATTHEW K. EDLING and VICTOR M. SHER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (th, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 31 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Matthew K. Edling to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (ROGERS, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 30 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Victor M. Sher to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (ROGERS, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: as to Matthew K. Edling, Esq. and Victor M. Sher, Esq. $ 300, receipt number NEW03984. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 29 Letter from Donald Camerson in lieu of a more formal submission as 3Ms application to join in the Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendants Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc. To Stay This Action Pending JPML Transfer Decision re #26 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion. (CAMPIONE, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
June 12, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel submitted on 6/11/2019 cannot be processed until pro hac counsel application fee has been paid. Please review the Electronic Notification for Pro Hac Vice instructions on our website. Counsel is advised to resubmit the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel once payment has been recorded. This message is for informational purposes only. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 28 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Victor M. Sher to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (ROGERS, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Matthew K. Edling to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (ROGERS, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP re #18 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HERTEN, THOMAS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER, granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Victor M. Sher and Matthew K. Edling; counsel shall each make payment of $150.00 to the Clerk, United States District Court, as required by Local Civil Rule 101.1(c)(3); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/4/2019. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 24 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #18 MOTION to Stay Corrected filing (ROGERS, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 23 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #18 MOTION to Stay (ROGERS, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #5 First MOTION to Remand (ROGERS, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 21 Letter from Donald Camerson on behalf of 3M Company joining in motion to stay and opposition to motion to remand re #19 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion, #5 First MOTION to Remand , #18 MOTION to Stay . (CAMERSON, DONALD)[Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD J. CAMPIONE on behalf of 3M COMPANY (CAMPIONE, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Stay . Motion set for 6/17/2019 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP re #5 First MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John A. Connor, #2 Certificate of Service)(HERTEN, THOMAS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay by CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(HERTEN, THOMAS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by 3M COMPANY, BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY, CHEMGUARD, INC., E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., NATIONAL FOAM, INC., THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP. (HERTEN, THOMAS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT re #10 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(ROGERS, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.. (FIETKIEWICZ, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #8 Letter Rule 7.1 re #5 First MOTION to Remand .( Motion reset for 6/3/2019 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court.). Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 5/3/2019. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #10 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 6/3/2019 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 3, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 submitted by M. Rogers, Esq. on 5/3/2019, contains an improper signature. Only Local Counsel is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. Please resubmit the Certification of Victor M. Sher, Esq. (signature page ONLY). This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP identifying Johnson Controls International plc [NYSE:JCI] as Corporate Parent.. (MCDONOUGH, NICOLE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHEMGUARD, INC. identifying Johnson Controls International plc [NYSE:JCI] as Corporate Parent.. (MCDONOUGH, NICOLE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLE GERRITSEN MCDONOUGH on behalf of CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP (MCDONOUGH, NICOLE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Matthew K. Edling, #2 Declaration Deckaration of Matthew S. Rogers, #3 Declaration Declaration of Victor M. Sher, #4 Statement Statement of Matthew S. Rogers in lieu of brief, #5 Text of Proposed Order Order)(ROGERS, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #5 First MOTION to Remand . (CAMPIONE, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #5 First MOTION to Remand requested by Defendants Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc.. (MCDONOUGH, NICOLE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M COMPANY. (CAMERSON, DONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY. (CORBO, ELLEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 First MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 5/20/2019 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION to Remand by RIDGEWOOD WATER. (Attachments: #1 Brief BRIEF, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF DAVE TERRY, #3 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(ROGERS, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 5/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/17/2019. (byl) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP. (HERTEN, THOMAS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
April 15, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP re #1 Notice of Removal, (HERTEN, THOMAS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP, CHEMGUARD, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey - Bergen County, case number BER-L-1447-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9575339), filed by TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP, CHEMGUARD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(HERTEN, THOMAS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ridgewood Water v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Represented By: Ellen N Corbo
Represented By: Ellen Nunno Corbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
Represented By: David R Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Represented By: Keith Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Thomas John Herten
Represented By: Nicole Gerritsen Mcdonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: David R Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Represented By: John Michael Fietkiewicz
Represented By: Luke Montgomery Allen
Represented By: Kirby D Shealy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Donald J. Camerson, II
Represented By: Ronald J. Campione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Thomas John Herten
Represented By: Nicole Gerritsen Mcdonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIDGEWOOD WATER
Represented By: Matthew S. Rogers
Represented By: Matthew K Edling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?