Gurbir S Grewal, Attorney General of the State of New Jersey et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez and New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection
Defendant: Abc Corporations, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, National Foam Inc, 3M Company, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Chemguard Inc and Tyco Fire Products LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv02199
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 21 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. An AMENDED COMPLAINT is to be filed in the member case only. When this document adds new defendant parties not currently listed as a party on the member case docket, the attorney filing user is to add each New Party, at the time of filing. ECF will prompt with "Please select the party that this filing is against"; the attorney filing user should choose to add each New Party and Select the Party at that time. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by David R Erickson on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co., E I Du Point De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, EI Du Pont de Nemours & Co, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, EI Du Pont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Erickson, David)
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Reply briefs are discouraged in the District of South Carolina, and any reply brief shall be submitted within seven (7) days of service of the responsive brief. Local Rule 7.07 D.S.C. Absent specific extenuating circumstances, the Court will not grant a motion, opposed or on consent, for an extension to file a reply brief. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A Maurice on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG(Maurice, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John K Dema on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez, Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG(Dema, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina N Stripp on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez, Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG(Stripp, Christina)
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin J Arenas on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez(Arenas, Justin) ***Refiled correctly in management case and spread to applicable member case(s), per Judge's filing instructions. Clerk instructs attorney filing user to file correctly for all future filings.*** Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG(sshe, ) Modified docket number on 9/10/2019 (sshe, ).
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E Kauff on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez(Kauff, Scott) ***Refiled correctly in management case and spread to applicable member case(s), per Judge's filing instructions. Clerk instructs attorney filing user to file correctly for all future filings.*** Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG(sshe, ) Modified docket number on 9/10/2019 (sshe, ).
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin J Arenas on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez (Arenas, Justin)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E Kauff on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez (Kauff, Scott)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Harrison on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG(Harrison, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Reap on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG(Reap, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lana M Rowenko on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez, NH, State of Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG, 2:19-cv-02285-RMG(Rowenko, Lana)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John DS Gilmour on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, NH, State of Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG, 2:19-cv-02285-RMG(Gilmour, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Jackson on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, NH, State of Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG, 2:19-cv-02285-RMG(Jackson, William)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New Jersey, 3:19-cv-14734, Gurbir S Grewal, Attorney General of the State of New Jersey et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-2199-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 5 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 9/6/2019 9:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:19-cv-14734. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of South Carolina. (MDL 2873 CTO #14 Judge Richard M. Gergel) (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by LEONARD Z. KAUFMANN on behalf of NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION, GURBIR S. GREWAL, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, PAUL R. RODRIGUEZ (KAUFMANN, LEONARD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 07/09/2019. (jmh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (jdb) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP, CHEMGUARD, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MERCER COUNTY case number MER-L953-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9792255), filed by TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP, CHEMGUARD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(HERTEN, THOMAS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gurbir S Grewal, Attorney General of the State of New Jersey et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abc Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Represented By: Ellen N Corbo
Represented By: Ellen Nunno Corbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EI Dupont De Nemours & Company
Represented By: David R Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: David R Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Represented By: Keith Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Donald J. Camerson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Nicole Gerritsen Mcdonough
Represented By: Thomas John Herten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Nicole Gerritsen Mcdonough
Represented By: Thomas John Herten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey
Represented By: Gwen Farley
Represented By: Leonard Z. Kaufmann
Represented By: Justin J Arenas
Represented By: Christina N Stripp
Represented By: Scott E Kauff
Represented By: Lana M Rowenko
Represented By: Joseph A Maurice
Represented By: John K Dema
Represented By: Daniel J Harrison
Represented By: David M Reap
Represented By: John DS Gilmour
Represented By: Leonard Z Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul R. Rodriguez
Represented By: Gwen Farley
Represented By: Leonard Z. Kaufmann
Represented By: Justin J Arenas
Represented By: Christina N Stripp
Represented By: Scott E Kauff
Represented By: Lana M Rowenko
Represented By: Joseph A Maurice
Represented By: John K Dema
Represented By: Daniel J Harrison
Represented By: David M Reap
Represented By: Leonard Z Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection
Represented By: Gwen Farley
Represented By: Leonard Z. Kaufmann
Represented By: Justin J Arenas
Represented By: Christina N Stripp
Represented By: Scott E Kauff
Represented By: William J Jackson
Represented By: Lana M Rowenko
Represented By: Joseph A Maurice
Represented By: John K Dema
Represented By: Daniel J Harrison
Represented By: David M Reap
Represented By: John DS Gilmour
Represented By: Leonard Z Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?