AutoMoney Inc v. Pippins
Plaintiff: AutoMoney Inc
Defendant: Deirdre Booker Pippins
Case Number: 2:2019cv02217
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Harris Robertso Brown on behalf of Deirdre Booker Pippins (Brown, Andrew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response filed by Deirdre Booker Pippins.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/11/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Killoren, Thomas)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response filed by AutoMoney Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/4/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Cooper, Lindsey)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Deirdre Booker Pippins.(Killoren, Thomas)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 Additional Attachments to Main Document #9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . First attachment description: Memorandum of Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Case Law- City of Myrtle Beach v. Buchannan Motels, LLC, C.A. No.: 4:10-cv-02884-RBH, #2 Exhibit 2- Case Law- Z-Man Fishing Products, Inc, et al. v Joseph F. Renosky, et al., No.: 2:12-cv-2906-DCN, #3 Exhibit 3- Case Law- Miller v. Augusta Mut. Ins. Co., No.: 04-2281, #4 Exhibit 4-Case Law- Peter B., et al. v Beverly Buscemi, et al., C.A. No.: 6:10-767-TMC, #5 Exhibit 5-Case Law-Ronald Courtney, et al. v Ingersoll-Rand Company, et al., C.A. No. 8:09-cv-01871-JMC, #6 Exhibit 6-Complaint- Deirdre Pippins v. AutoMoney, Inc., C.A. No.: 19CVS8568, #7 Exhibit 7-Case Law-Lyndon Southern Ins. Co. v. Solomon Victor Walker, C.A. No.: 9:18-cv-3019-RMG)(Killoren, Thomas) Modified on 9/20/2019 to correct attachment(s) description(s) for exhibit(s)(sshe, ). Modified on 9/27/2019 to edit docket text for incorrect event type by filing user, per chambers(sshe, ).
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Deirdre Booker Pippins. Response to Motion due by 10/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Killoren, Thomas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 5 Reason: Attorney refiled corrected signature document by correct associated attorney filing user. Corrected Filing Document Number #7 (sshe, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AutoMoney Inc. Deirdre Booker Pippins served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(Humphries, Christina) Modified on 9/11/2019 to reference dates for service and answer due (sshe, ).
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Browne Humphries on behalf of AutoMoney Inc (Humphries, Christina)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Deirdre Booker Pippins. (sshe, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by AutoMoney Inc.(sshe, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deirdre Booker Pippins ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8602486.), filed by AutoMoney Inc. Service due by 11/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Loan Agreement)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AutoMoney Inc v. Pippins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AutoMoney Inc
Represented By: Margarete Linsay Allio
Represented By: Lindsey W Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Christina Browne Humphries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deirdre Booker Pippins
Represented By: Thomas A Killoren, Jr
Represented By: Andrew Harris Robertso Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?