McAdory et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Leroy McAdory and Ruth M McAdory
Defendant: Crane Co, Grinnell LLC, Copes-Vulcan Inc, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Bayer Cropscience Inc, John Crane Inc, IMO Industries Inc, General Electric Company, Dana Companies LLC, William Powell Company, The, JR Clarkson Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Greene Tweed & Company Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Neles-Jamesbury Inc, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Milwaukee Valve Company, Riley Power Inc, AW Chesterton Company, Union Carbide Corporation and CBS Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv02279
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 67 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by IMO Industries Inc.(Collins, William)
October 10, 2019 Filing 66 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by IMO Industries Inc.(Collins, William)
October 9, 2019 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Techman, Jennifer)
October 9, 2019 Filing 64 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
October 9, 2019 Filing 63 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 30, 2019 Filing 62 John Crane Inc Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John Crane Inc.(Elliott, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 61 John Crane Inc ANSWER to #1 Complaint by John Crane Inc.(Elliott, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by James H Elliott, Jr on behalf of John Crane Inc (Elliott, James)
September 27, 2019 Filing 59 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Greene Tweed & Company Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 27, 2019 Filing 58 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Greene Tweed & Company Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 23, 2019 Filing 57 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Inabinet, George)
September 20, 2019 Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Holdings Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc for Industrial Holdings Corporation.. (Inabinet, George)
September 18, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Philip C. Reid ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8676109) by JR Clarkson Company. Response to Motion due by 10/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit PHV Application, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(McLeod, Yancey)
September 16, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E Frick on behalf of Bayer Cropscience Inc, Union Carbide Corporation (Frick, Scott)
September 16, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Moffatt Grier McDonald on behalf of Bayer Cropscience Inc (McDonald, Moffatt)
September 16, 2019 Filing 52 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bayer Cropscience Inc.(Conner, William)
September 16, 2019 Filing 51 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bayer Cropscience Inc.(Conner, William)
September 16, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by William David Conner on behalf of Bayer Cropscience Inc, Union Carbide Corporation (Conner, William)
September 15, 2019 Filing 48 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by IMO Industries Inc.(Collins, William)
September 15, 2019 Filing 47 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Crane Co.(Sullivan, Tara)
September 15, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Crane Co.(Sullivan, Tara)
September 13, 2019 Filing 45 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Leroy McAdory, Ruth M McAdory. DEFENDANTS Crane Co served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019; IMO Industries Inc served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Swett, William)
September 12, 2019 Filing 43 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Neles-Jamesbury Inc.(Barnes, Andrew)
September 12, 2019 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint by Neles-Jamesbury Inc.(Barnes, Andrew)
September 12, 2019 Filing 41 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by JR Clarkson Company.(McLeod, Yancey)
September 12, 2019 Filing 40 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Riley Power Inc.(Early, William)
September 12, 2019 Filing 39 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Dana Companies LLC.(Early, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 38 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Milwaukee Valve Company.(Pugh, Steven)
September 11, 2019 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dana Companies LLC identifying Other Affiliate DCo, LLC for Dana Companies LLC.. (Early, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dana Companies LLC.(Early, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by William P Early on behalf of Dana Companies LLC (Early, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riley Power Inc. (Early, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Riley Power Inc.(Early, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by William P Early on behalf of Riley Power Inc (Early, William)
September 10, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E Thoensen on behalf of Milwaukee Valve Company (Thoensen, Joseph)
September 9, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by JR Clarkson Company.(McLeod, Yancey)
September 9, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Yancey Alford McLeod, III on behalf of JR Clarkson Company (McLeod, Yancey)
September 9, 2019 Filing 28 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Union Carbide Corporation.(McDonald, Moffatt)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/30/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/15/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/15/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/9/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/7/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/6/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/13/2020, Discovery due by 3/9/2020, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 3/23/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 7/6/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/9/2019. (sshe, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(McDonald, Moffatt)
September 9, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Moffatt Grier McDonald on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (McDonald, Moffatt)
September 9, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Milwaukee Valve Company.(Pugh, Steven)
September 9, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Wall, Mark)
September 9, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Inabinet, George)
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by General Electric Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Copes-Vulcan Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Techman, Jennifer)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Copes-Vulcan Inc. (Techman, Jennifer)
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by General Electric Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Copes-Vulcan Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by William Powell Company, The.(Elliott, James)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Walker Barnes on behalf of Neles-Jamesbury Inc (Barnes, Andrew)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Grinnell LLC.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Grinnell LLC.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Leroy McAdory, Ruth M McAdory. DEFENDANTS Dana Companies LLC served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019; Milwaukee Valve Company served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; William Powell Company, The served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Swett, William)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Leroy McAdory, Ruth M McAdory. DEFENDANTS Air & Liquid Systems Corporation served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; CBS Corporation served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Greene Tweed & Company Inc served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Grinnell LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Industrial Holdings Corporation served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; JR Clarkson Company served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Neles-Jamesbury Inc served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipts)(Swett, William)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Leroy McAdory, Ruth M McAdory. DEFENDANT Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Swett, William)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Leroy McAdory, Ruth M McAdory. DEFENDANTS AW Chesterton Company served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; General Electric Company served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Ingersoll-Rand Company served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; John Crane Inc served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Riley Power Inc served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Union Carbide Corporation served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipts)(Swett, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Leroy McAdory, Ruth M McAdory.(sshe, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8613486.), filed by Leroy McAdory, Ruth M McAdory. Service due by 11/12/2019(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAdory et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: Christopher Austin Jaros
Represented By: Tara Cloer Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes-Vulcan Inc
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: David Gaillard Traylor, Jr
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: George L Inabinet, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience Inc
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc
Represented By: James H Elliott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: William Ansel Collins, Jr
Represented By: Michal Kalwajtys
Represented By: Thomas F Dougall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: William P Early
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company, The
Represented By: James H Elliott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JR Clarkson Company
Represented By: Timothy William Bouch
Represented By: Yancey Alford McLeod, III
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Melvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Tweed & Company Inc
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Hedderman Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neles-Jamesbury Inc
Represented By: Andrew Walker Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company
Represented By: Joseph E Thoensen
Represented By: Steven J Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power Inc
Represented By: William P Early
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AW Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy McAdory
Represented By: William Christopher Swett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth M McAdory
Represented By: William Christopher Swett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?