State of Vermont v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Defendant: Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, National Foam Inc, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Chemguard Inc, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, 3M Company and Tyco Fire Products LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv02281
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha N Donovan on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Donovan, Martha)
October 7, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Raymond-Flood on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Raymond-Flood, Margaret)
October 4, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by R Steven DeGeorge on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, The Chemours Company LLC, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company, The, Chemours Company, The Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(DeGeorge, R)
October 4, 2019 Filing 53 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. An AMENDED COMPLAINT is to be filed in the member case only. When this document adds new defendant parties not currently listed as a party on the member case docket, the attorney filing user is to add each New Party, at the time of filing. ECF will prompt with "Please select the party that this filing is against"; the attorney filing user should choose to add each New Party and Select the Party at that time. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by David R Erickson on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co., E I Du Point De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, EI Du Pont de Nemours & Co, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, EI Du Pont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Erickson, David)
October 2, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine LI Hacker on behalf of Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02281-RMG(Hacker, Katherine)
October 2, 2019 Filing 50 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 332, 49 Reason: Document should be filed with the JPML. Filing date of original filing: 10/1/2019 Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02281-RMG(sshe, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T Richardson on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Richardson, Matthew)
October 1, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lucille Dinkins on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dinkins, Mary)
October 1, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice W Parham Casey on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Casey, Alice)
October 1, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Moylan, III on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Moylan, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Reply briefs are discouraged in the District of South Carolina, and any reply brief shall be submitted within seven (7) days of service of the responsive brief. Local Rule 7.07 D.S.C. Absent specific extenuating circumstances, the Court will not grant a motion, opposed or on consent, for an extension to file a reply brief. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison S Brouk on behalf of State of Vermont Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02281-RMG(Brouk, Allison)
September 23, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth B Petersen on behalf of State of Vermont Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02281-RMG(Petersen, Elizabeth)
September 23, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Allan Kanner on behalf of State of Vermont Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02281-RMG(Kanner, Allan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Kelman on behalf of State of Vermont (Kelman, Wesley) ***Refiled correctly in management case and spread to applicable member case(s), per Judge's filing instructions. Clerk instructs attorney filing user to file correctly (and list the applicable member case number(s) on document(s)) for all future filings.*** Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02281-RMG(sshe, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Steve W Berman on behalf of State of Vermont Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02281-RMG(Berman, Steve)
September 12, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M Cox on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, The Chemours Company LLC, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company, The, Chemours Company, The Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cox, Stephen)
August 14, 2019 Filing 37 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Vermont, 2:19-cv-00134, State of Vermont v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-2281-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 5 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 9/6/2019 9:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 36 Case transferred in from District of Vermont; Case Number 2:19-cv-00134. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 14, 2019 Filing 35 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-17) In Re: Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation (MDL No. 2873). Case transferred to District of South Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Schedule CTO-17 - Tag-Along Actions)(law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #24 Summons Returned Executed as to The Chemours Company. The incorrect document was attached and has been replaced. The correct document is now attached to #24 and this entry. (law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019.(Murphy, Laura) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. The Chemours Company FC, LLC served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019.(Murphy, Laura) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Corteva, Inc. served on 7/30/2019. (Murphy, Laura) Answer deadline removed on 8/9/2019 pursuant to #17 Stipulation and Order (law). [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. The Chemours Company served on 7/30/2019.(Murphy, Laura) Answer deadline removed on 8/9/2019 pursuant to #17 Stipulation and Order (law). (Main Document 24 replaced on 8/9/2019) (law). [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company served on 7/30/2019.(Murphy, Laura) Answer deadline removed on 8/9/2019 pursuant to #17 Stipulation and Order (law). [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 31 LETTER by State of Vermont re: irregularities in #26 - #30 Summons Return Executed and all four defendants are being re-served. (originally filed 8/5/2019 in state court) (law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Chemguard, Inc. served on 7/17/2019. (originally filed 8/5/2019 in state court)(law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company served on 7/15/2019. (originally filed 8/5/2019 in state court)(law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. The Chemours Company served on 7/15/2019. (originally filed 8/5/2019 in state court)(law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Corteva, Inc. served on 7/15/2019. (originally filed 8/5/2019 in state court)(law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. The Chemours Company FC, LLC served on 7/15/2019. (originally filed 8/5/2019 in state court)(law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 22 RECEIVED UPDATED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (Attachments removed on 8/9/2019 (law). [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert F. McDougall, Esq on behalf of State of Vermont.(McDougall, Robert) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura B. Murphy, Esq on behalf of State of Vermont.(Murphy, Laura) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin A. Krass on behalf of State of Vermont.(Krass, Benjamin) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew F. Pawa on behalf of State of Vermont.(Pawa, Matthew) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending time to Answer. Should the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") decline to transfer this action to the pending AFFF Multidistrict Litigation ("MDL") in the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina, Defendants shall have through and including the 28th day after such disposition to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Should the JPML transfer the action to the MDL, Defendants shall follow the MDL's established procedures for responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 8/6/2019.(jbr) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (originally filed 8/1/2019 in state court)(law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura B. Murphy, Esq on behalf of State of Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 8/1/2019 in state court)(law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert F. McDougall, Esq on behalf of State of Vermont. (originally filed 8/1/2019 in state court)(law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (originally filed 7/25/2019 in state court)(law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. National Foam, Inc. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (originally filed 7/25/2019 in state court)(law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Tyco Fire Products L.P. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (originally filed 7/25/2019 in state court)(law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Dupont De Nemours, Inc. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (originally filed 7/25/2019 in state court)(law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. 3M Company served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (originally filed 7/25/2019 in state court)(law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED Unexecuted by State of Vermont as to Buckeye Fire Equipment Company. (originally filed 7/22/2019 in state court)(law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assigned Docket Number. (originally filed 7/1/2019 in state court)(law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P. filed by State of Vermont. (originally filed 6/26/2019 in state court) (law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (law) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by 3M Company (Berger, Ritchie) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER requesting certified docket sheet and original file from state court. (pac) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by 3M Company. (pac) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company, Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P. from VT Superior Court, Chittenden Unit, Civil Division, case number 546-6-19 Cncv. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac) [Transferred from Vermont on 8/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Vermont v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Represented By: Alice W Parham Casey
Represented By: Mary Lucille Dinkins
Represented By: Katherine LI Hacker
Represented By: John C Moylan, III
Represented By: Matthew T Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours, Inc.
Represented By: Alice W Parham Casey
Represented By: Mary Lucille Dinkins
Represented By: Katherine LI Hacker
Represented By: John C Moylan, III
Represented By: Matthew T Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Represented By: Ellen N Corbo
Represented By: Ellen Nunno Corbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company, The
Represented By: Stephen M Cox
Represented By: David R Erickson
Represented By: R Steven DeGeorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: Alice W Parham Casey
Represented By: David R Erickson
Represented By: Mary Lucille Dinkins
Represented By: John C Moylan, III
Represented By: Matthew T Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Represented By: Keith Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Joseph G Petrosinelli
Represented By: Liam J Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company FC LLC, The
Represented By: Stephen M Cox
Represented By: David R Erickson
Represented By: R Steven DeGeorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Ritchie E. Berger, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Joseph G Petrosinelli
Represented By: Liam J Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Represented By: Joshua R. Diamond, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew F. Pawa, Esq.
Represented By: Robert F. McDougall, Esq.
Represented By: Laura B. Murphy, Esq.
Represented By: Benjamin A. Krass, Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Donovan, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Matthew F Pawa
Represented By: Benjamin A Krass
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: Elizabeth B Petersen
Represented By: Allison S Brouk
Represented By: Robert F McDougall
Represented By: Laura B Murphy
Represented By: Wesley Kelman
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?