Bryant v. City of Charleston Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Anthony G Bryant
Defendant: Charleston County Consolidated Schools, Town of Mount Pleasant Police, South Carolina Law Enforcement Division, City of North Charleston Police, Charleston County Sheriffs Office, City of Charleston Police Department and City of North Charleston Police Department
Case Number: 2:2019cv02304
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of USCA as to #13 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anthony G Bryant. The court consolidates case Nos. 19-1984, 19-1985, 19-1986 with case No. 19-1983(L). (cpeg, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 ASSEMBLED INITIAL ELECTRONIC RECORD TRANSMITTED TO FOURTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re #13 Notice of Appeal, Electronic record successfully transmitted. (hada, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #14 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Anthony G Bryant 2123 Courtland Avenue Charleston, SC 29403 (hada, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re #13 Notice of Appeal, The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (hada, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Order, by Anthony G Bryant. - Filing fee $ 505. The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(hada, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Additional Supporting Documents. (hada, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Anthony Bryant at 2123 Courtland Avenue Charleston, SC 29403. (vdru, ) (vdru, ).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: Plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) from the date of entry of this Order to pay the full filing fee for this case. This civil action will be summarily dismissed if the plaintiff fails to pay the full filing fee. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 8/22/2019.(vdru, ) Modified to correct signature date on 8/28/2019 (vdru, ).
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Anthony G. Bryant 2123 Courtland Avenue Charleston, SC 29403 (hada, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Additional Supporting Documents. (hada, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Supporting Documents. (hada, )
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Last year this Court entered a pre-filing injunction against Plaintiff. In keeping with that injunction, the Court has since denied Plaintiff IFP status in a subsequent case. The injunction requires Plaintiff to pay the full filing fee before he may proceed with a civil action. If he pays the full filing fee within fifteen days of this order, this case will proceed to initial review. If he does not, this civil action will be summarily dismissed. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 08/22/2019. (hada, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Anthony G Bryant. Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(hada, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charleston County Consolidated Schools, Charleston County Sheriffs Office, City of Charleston Police Department, City of North Charleston Police, City of North Charleston Police Department, South Carolina Law Enforcement Division, Town of Mount Pleasant Police, filed by Anthony G Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(hada, ) Modified to add links to #5 and #6 Additional Attachments on 8/28/2019 (hada, ). Modified: Additional Attachments added as #12 on 8/29/19 (rshu, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. City of Charleston Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony G Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston County Consolidated Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Mount Pleasant Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Law Enforcement Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of North Charleston Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston County Sheriffs Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Charleston Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of North Charleston Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?