McClellan v. Fluor Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Latoya McClellan
Defendant: Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Fluor-Lane South Carolina, LLC and Fluor Craft Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02453
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bristow Marchant
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/12/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/12/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/13/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/13/2020, Discovery due by 3/13/2020, Motions due by 5/13/2020, Mediation Due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 10/24/2019. (egra, )
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 10/24/2019.(egra, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Latoya McClellan.(Ricker, Brice)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Fluor Craft Services, Inc..(Byzet, Piper)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Fluor Craft Services, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 11/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Confidentiality Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Byzet, Piper)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Fluor Craft Services, Inc..(Byzet, Piper)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Fluor Craft Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Byzet, Piper)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant, Fluor-Lane South Carolina, LLC ONLY by Latoya McClellan. (Ricker, Brice)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Correcting Defendant by Latoya McClellan. (Ricker, Brice)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/8/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/22/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/22/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/12/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/12/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/13/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/13/2020, Discovery due by 3/13/2020, Motions due by 5/13/2020, Mediation Due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 09/17/2019. (egra, ) Modified on 9/18/2019 to edit docket text (egra, ).
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Case No. 2:19-2447 is consolidated with Case No. 2:19-2453. The Clerk is directed to close case No. 2:19-2447. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 09/12/2019. (egra, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Fluor-Lane South Carolina, LLC.(Lambert, Norman)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Fluor-Lane South Carolina, LLC.(Cuttino, Ashley)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Charleston County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Acknowledgement of Removal to Federal Court)(Byzet, Piper)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(hada, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-10-03811. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8643131), filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Notice of Filing)(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClellan v. Fluor Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Prickett Cuttino
Represented By: Piper Reiff Byzet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor-Lane South Carolina, LLC
Represented By: Dennis Gregory Placone
Represented By: Norman Ward Lambert
Represented By: Ashley Prickett Cuttino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Craft Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Prickett Cuttino
Represented By: Piper Reiff Byzet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya McClellan
Represented By: Brice E Ricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?