B.A.C Home Loans Service, L.P. v. Koola et al
Plaintiff: B.A.C Home Loans Service, L.P.
Defendant: First Citizens Bank and Trust Company, Inc., Johnson D. Koola and Cambridge Lakes Condominium Homeowners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02530
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 19 Pro Se Party's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Johnson D. Koola. (egra, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION seeking permission to pay the filing fee in full and for clarification of the caption of the case by Johnson D. Koola. Response to Motion due by 11/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Bristow Marchant. (egra, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION seeking permission to respond to Plaintiff's October 28, 2019 Reply by Johnson D. Koola. Response to Motion due by 11/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Bristow Marchant. (egra, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by B.A.C Home Loans Service, L.P. re #15 Reply to Response to Motion, (Johnson, Louise)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions Response filed by B.A.C Home Loans Service, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bankruptcy Order 2019, #2 Exhibit Bankruptcy Amended Order 2019)(Johnson, Louise)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions Response filed by Johnson D. Koola. Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/29/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (egra, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 Proper Form Order with interrogatories, 12 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Johnson D. Koola 1587 Cambridge Lakes Dr. Mt. Pleasant SC, 29 29464 (egra, )
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REFERENCE #11 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 10/15/2019. (egra, )
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 11/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories) (egra, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by B.A.C Home Loans Service, L.P. re #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions (Johnson, Louise)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions by B.A.C Home Loans Service, L.P.. Response to Motion due by 10/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Foreclosure Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Amended Foreclosure Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Defendant Koola's Answer and Crossclaim, #4 Exhibit Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit SC Ct. Appeals Opinion Affirming Summary Judgment, #6 Exhibit S.C. Ct. App. Order Denying Rehearing, #7 Exhibit District Court Order Remanding Case)No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Johnson, Louise)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Louise Myers Johnson on behalf of B.A.C Home Loans Service, L.P. (Johnson, Louise)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Notice declining consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Johnson D. Koola. (egra, ) Modified on 9/10/2019 to edit docket text (egra, ).
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Johnson D. Koola. Response to Motion due by 9/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Bristow Marchant. (egra, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/10/2019) (egra, ). Modified on 9/10/2019 to replace with corrected document (egra, ). (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/11/2019) (egra, ). Modified on 9/11/2019 to add case number to document (egra, ).
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2010-cp-10-6060. (), filed by Johnson D. Koola. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Supporting Documents) (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B.A.C Home Loans Service, L.P. v. Koola et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.A.C Home Loans Service, L.P.
Represented By: John B Kelchner
Represented By: John S Kay
Represented By: H Guyton Murrell
Represented By: Louise Myers Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Citizens Bank and Trust Company, Inc.
Represented By: S Nelson Weston, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson D. Koola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge Lakes Condominium Homeowners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene Patrick Corrigan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?