25 Calhoun CMB LLC v. Concord Park-Charleston LLC
Plaintiff: 25 Calhoun CMB LLC
Defendant: Concord Park-Charleston LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02537
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by 25 Calhoun CMB LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(Coker, Thomas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/24/2019) (sshe, ). Modified on 10/24/2019 to replace with corrected document and to edit description for exhibit as requested and provided by filing user(sshe, ).
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by 25 Calhoun CMB LLC. (Attachments: #1 Joint Discovery Plan, #2 Mediation Form)(Coker, Thomas)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Concord Park-Charleston LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Watkins, William)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by 25 Calhoun CMB LLC.(Coker, Thomas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth LaMance Bakker on behalf of 25 Calhoun CMB LLC (Bakker, Elizabeth)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/8/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/22/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/22/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/16/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/15/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/14/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/21/2020, Discovery due by 3/16/2020, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 3/30/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 7/1/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/17/2019. (sshe, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Concord Park-Charleston LLC. (sshe, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Concord Park-Charleston LLC.(sshe, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-10-03853. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8658589), filed by Concord Park-Charleston LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Organization for Concord Park-Charleston LLC, #2 Exhibit B Certificate of Administrative Dissolution(Revocation), #3 Exhibit C State Court Documents)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 25 Calhoun CMB LLC v. Concord Park-Charleston LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 25 Calhoun CMB LLC
Represented By: Thomas Holloway Coker, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth LaMance Bakker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concord Park-Charleston LLC
Represented By: John J Dodds, IV
Represented By: William Wharton Watkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?