Staley-Bullock v. Berkeley County School District
Plaintiff: Cheryl Staley-Bullock
Defendant: Berkeley County School District
Case Number: 2:2019cv02566
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl Staley-Bullock. Berkeley County School District served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/05/2019. (hada, ) (Main Document 19 replaced on 11/8/2019) (hada, ). Modified to correct document and dates on 11/8/2019 (hada, ).
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 12/6/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/6/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/4/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/4/2020, Discovery due by 3/5/2020, Motions due by 5/4/2020, Mediation Due by 4/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 11/06/2019. (hada, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Berkeley County School District.(Ferguson, Emmanuel)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Berkeley County School District. Service due by 12/27/2019 (hada, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #13 Order Service - Non-Inmate placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Cheryl Staley-Bullock 510 Hallmark Drive Apt. 510 Goose Creek, SC 29445 (hada, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 09/25/2019. (hada, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Proper Form Order with required documents, 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Cheryl Staley-Bullock 510 Hallmark Drive Apt. 510 Goose Creek, SC 29445 (hada, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REFERENCE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 09/18/2019.(hada, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 10/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 09/18/2019. (hada, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cheryl Staley-Bullock.(hada, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Cheryl Staley-Bullock. Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(hada, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NON-STANDARD ITEM RECEIVED: CD containing audio recording of appeal hearing from Cheryl Staley-Bullock re: #1 Complaint. (hada, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Berkeley County School District, filed by Cheryl Staley-Bullock. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staley-Bullock v. Berkeley County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Staley-Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkeley County School District
Represented By: Emmanuel Joseph Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?