Van Lew v. W L Gore & Associates Inc et al
Plaintiff: Dawn D Van Lew
Defendant: Doctor Three John Doe, Jane Doe and W L Gore & Associates Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv02890
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by All Parties by W L Gore & Associates Inc. (Willis, Marguerite)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Marguerite S. Willis to Lynn Steithel Confirming Consent to 30-Day Extension. (Willis, Marguerite)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time: The Deadline for the Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended for thirty (30) days,through and including November 18, 2019. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/18/2019.(vdru, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by W L Gore & Associates Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/31/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Willis, Marguerite)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by W L Gore & Associates Inc.(vdru, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Berkeley County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-08-01259. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8718904), filed by W L Gore & Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Documents). (vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Lew v. W L Gore & Associates Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Three John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W L Gore & Associates Inc
Represented By: Marguerite S Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn D Van Lew
Represented By: Lynn Seithel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?