Maney v. Mason Preparatory School
Plaintiff: Rachael Maney
Defendant: Mason Preparatory School
Case Number: 2:2019cv02899
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Deadline extended until 12/11/2019. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/2/2019.(vdru, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Mason Preparatory School. Response to Motion due by 12/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Ramia, Stephanie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is ordered that Joseph J. Wardenski who represents the Plaintiff in this case is granted admission pro hac vice in this case. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/15/2019.(vdru, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph J. Wardenski ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8778521) by Rachael Maney. Response to Motion due by 12/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Mullaney, Marybeth)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Reed N.Colfax who represents the plaintiff is granted Pro Hac Vice admission in this case. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/14/2019.(vdru, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reed N. Colfax ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8776001) by Rachael Maney. Response to Motion due by 11/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Mullaney, Marybeth)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rachael Maney. Mason Preparatory School served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Mullaney, Marybeth)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mason Preparatory School. (vdru, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Rachael Maney.(vdru, ) . Modified to remove attachment added in error on 10/16/2019 (vdru, ).
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mason Preparatory School ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8720049.), filed by Rachael Maney. Service due by 1/9/2020.(vdru, ) Modified to add main document on 10/15/2019 (vdru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maney v. Mason Preparatory School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Maney
Represented By: Marybeth E Mullaney
Represented By: Reed N Colfax
Represented By: Joseph John Wardenski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason Preparatory School
Represented By: Stephanie N Ramia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?