South Carolina Coastal Conservation League et al v. Wheeler et al
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife, South Carolina Coastal Conservation League, North Carolina Coastal Federation, Friends of the Rappahannock, Clean Water Action, National Wildlife Federation, Charleston Waterkeeper, Chattahoochee Riverkeeper, American Rivers, North Carolina Wildlife Federation and Natural Resources Defense Council
Defendant: Andrew R Wheeler, US Army Corps of Engineers, US Environmental Protection Agency and Rickey Dale James
Intervenor Defendant: Public Lands Council, American Petroleum Institute, National Association of Home Builders, U.S. Poultry & Egg Association, National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association, Edison Electric Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Association of Manufacturers, Leading Builders of America, National Pork Producers Council, South Carolina Farm Bureau Federation, American Farm Bureau Federation, National Alliance of Forest Owners and National Mining Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv03006
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brett E. Legner ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8836948) by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Edison Electric Institute, Leading Builders of America, National Alliance of Forest Owners, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association, Public Lands Council, South Carolina Farm Bureau Federation, U.S. Poultry & Egg Association. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application / Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Lavender, William)
December 18, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Colleen M. Campbell ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8836893) by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Edison Electric Institute, Leading Builders of America, National Alliance of Forest Owners, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry & Egg Association. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application / Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Lavender, William)
December 18, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Timothy S. Bishop ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8836855) by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Edison Electric Institute, Leading Builders of America, National Alliance of Forest Owners, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association, Public Lands Council, South Carolina Farm Bureau Federation, U.S. Poultry & Egg Association. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application / Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Lavender, William)
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Intervene and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Edison Electric Institute, Leading Builders of America, National Alliance of Forest Owners, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry & Egg Association, South Carolina Farm Bureau Federation. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Business Intervenors' Proposed Answer)No proposed order.(Lavender, William)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion by Geoffrey R. Gisler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 11/18/2019.(jbry, )
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion by Kelly F. Moser to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 11/18/2019.(jbry, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Geoffrey R. Gisler ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8780519) by American Rivers, Charleston Waterkeeper, Chattahoochee Riverkeeper, Clean Water Action, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of the Rappahannock, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, North Carolina Coastal Federation, North Carolina Wildlife Federation, South Carolina Coastal Conservation League. Response to Motion due by 12/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (1) Application for Admission PHV, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Holman, J)
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly F. Moser ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8780468) by American Rivers, Charleston Waterkeeper, Chattahoochee Riverkeeper, Clean Water Action, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of the Rappahannock, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, North Carolina Coastal Federation, North Carolina Wildlife Federation, South Carolina Coastal Conservation League. Response to Motion due by 12/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (1) Motion in Support of Application/Affidavit for PHV, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Holman, J)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natural Resources Defense Council, North Carolina Coastal Federation, American Rivers, National Wildlife Federation, South Carolina Coastal Conservation League, Charleston Waterkeeper, Chattahoochee Riverkeeper, Clean Water Action, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of the Rappahannock, North Carolina Wildlife Federation. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service - Andrew Wheeler, EPA, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service - U.S. EPA, #3 Exhibit C - Proof of Service - RD James, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, #4 Exhibit D - Proof of Service - U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, #5 Exhibit E -Return Receipt - W. Barr, U.S. AG, #6 Exhibit F - Return Receipt - Lydon, US Attorney-SC)(Holman, J)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jbry, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Coastal Conservation League.(jbry, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by North Carolina Wildlife Federation.(jbry, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by North Carolina Coastal Federation.(jbry, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Natural Resources Defense Council.(jbry, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by National Wildlife Federation.(jbry, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Friends of the Rappahannock.(jbry, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Defenders of Wildlife.(jbry, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Clean Water Action.(jbry, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Chattahoochee Riverkeeper.(jbry, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Charleston Waterkeeper.(jbry, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American Rivers.(jbry, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8738408.), filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, North Carolina Coastal Federation, American Rivers, National Wildlife Federation, South Carolina Coastal Conservation League, Charleston Waterkeeper, Chattahoochee Riverkeeper, Clean Water Action, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of the Rappahannock, North Carolina Wildlife Federation. Service due by 1/21/2020(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Carolina Coastal Conservation League et al v. Wheeler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew R Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickey Dale James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: J Blanding Holman, IV
Represented By: Frank S Holleman, III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Represented By: Geoffrey Randall Gisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina Coastal Conservation League
Represented By: J Blanding Holman, IV
Represented By: Frank S Holleman, III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Represented By: Geoffrey Randall Gisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Carolina Coastal Federation
Represented By: J Blanding Holman, IV
Represented By: Frank S Holleman, III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Represented By: Geoffrey Randall Gisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Rappahannock
Represented By: J Blanding Holman, IV
Represented By: Frank S Holleman, III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Represented By: Geoffrey Randall Gisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clean Water Action
Represented By: J Blanding Holman, IV
Represented By: Frank S Holleman, III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Represented By: Geoffrey Randall Gisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Wildlife Federation
Represented By: J Blanding Holman, IV
Represented By: Frank S Holleman, III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Represented By: Geoffrey Randall Gisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charleston Waterkeeper
Represented By: J Blanding Holman, IV
Represented By: Frank S Holleman, III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Represented By: Geoffrey Randall Gisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chattahoochee Riverkeeper
Represented By: J Blanding Holman, IV
Represented By: Frank S Holleman, III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Represented By: Geoffrey Randall Gisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Rivers
Represented By: J Blanding Holman, IV
Represented By: Frank S Holleman, III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Represented By: Geoffrey Randall Gisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Carolina Wildlife Federation
Represented By: J Blanding Holman, IV
Represented By: Frank S Holleman, III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Represented By: Geoffrey Randall Gisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: J Blanding Holman, IV
Represented By: Frank S Holleman, III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Represented By: Geoffrey Randall Gisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Public Lands Council
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender, Jr
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: American Petroleum Institute
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender, Jr
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Association of Home Builders
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender, Jr
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: U.S. Poultry & Egg Association
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender, Jr
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender, Jr
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Edison Electric Institute
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender, Jr
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: American Road and Transportation Builders Association
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender, Jr
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Cattlemen's Beef Association
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender, Jr
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Corn Growers Association
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender, Jr
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Association of Manufacturers
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender, Jr
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Leading Builders of America
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender, Jr
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Pork Producers Council
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender, Jr
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: South Carolina Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender, Jr
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: American Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender, Jr
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Alliance of Forest Owners
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender, Jr
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Mining Association
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender, Jr
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?