Crotty v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Crotty
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Dowdupont Inc, Arkema France SA, AGC Inc, BASF Corporation, 3M Company, The, National Foam Inc, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Chemours Company LLC, The, Arkema Inc, United Technologies Corporation, Tyco Fire Products LP, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Kidde PLC Inc, Chubb Fire LTD, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Clariant Corporation, Chemguard Inc and Archroma US Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv03047
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E Raynal, IV on behalf of Clariant Corporation Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01275-RMG, 2:19-cv-01382-RMG, 2:19-cv-03047-RMG(Raynal, Charles)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER This Document Relates to Case No. 2:19-cv-3047-RMG granting ((430) in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (12) in case 2:19-cv-03047-RMG) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Archroma's response to the Plaintiff's Complaint is now January 7, 2020. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/18/2019.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-03047-RMG(sshe, ) (Main Document 439 replaced on 12/19/2019) (sshe, ). Modified on 12/19/2019 to replace with corrected document(sshe, ).
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE ADDENDUM TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In addition to counsel preparing and submitting all proposed orders in Word document format via email to chambers at gergel_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov, please include the master MDL docket entry number of the motion filed (and spread to applicable member case(s)) in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG to which the proposed order relates. Please reference within the proposed order in Word document format as well as the subject line of the email to chambers. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. SECOND NOTICE regarding Counsel should prepare and submit all proposed orders in Word document format via email to chambers at gergel_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BASF Corporation.(Holian, Matthew)
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Respond to Complaint by Archroma US Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Adina Bingham, #2 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-03047-RMG(McCall, Duke)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A Holian on behalf of BASF Corporation Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01275-RMG, 2:19-cv-01382-RMG, 2:19-cv-03047-RMG(Holian, Matthew)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David B Dwerlkotte on behalf of E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, EI Du Pont de Nemours & Co, The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C., E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co., E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, E I Du Point De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company LLC, EI Du Pont de Nemours and Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dwerlkotte, David)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Clariant Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01275-RMG, 2:19-cv-01382-RMG, 2:19-cv-03047-RMG(Jordan, Robert)(sshe, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D Weber on behalf of Clariant Corporation(Weber, Steven) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01275-RMG, 2:19-cv-01382-RMG, 2:19-cv-03047-RMG ***Refiled correctly in management case and spread to applicable member case(s), per Judge's filing instructions.(sshe, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert H Jordan on behalf of Clariant Corporation(Jordan, Robert) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01275-RMG, 2:19-cv-01382-RMG, 2:19-cv-03047-RMG ***Refiled correctly in management case and spread to applicable member case(s), per Judge's filing instructions.(sshe, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric P Gotting on behalf of Archroma US Inc (Gotting, Eric)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Archroma US Inc answer due 12/16/2019. (Gotting, Eric)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT Re: General Denial And Preliminary Statement Of Affirmative Defenses by Arkema Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Eaton, Maja)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Crotty v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-3047-RMG Plaintiff state of residence: New Hampshire. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 6 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 11/1/2019 12:30 PM, in Charleston Courtroom #1), J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8745453.), filed by Deborah Crotty. Service due by 1/27/2020(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crotty v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dowdupont Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema France SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Matthew A Holian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company LLC, The
Represented By: David B Dwerlkotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: David B Dwerlkotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Fire LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clariant Corporation
Represented By: Robert H Jordan
Represented By: Steven D Weber
Represented By: Charles E Raynal, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma US Inc
Represented By: Eric P Gotting
Represented By: Duke K McCall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Crotty
Represented By: Merritt E Cunningham
Represented By: Michael G Stag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?